Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0507498

EP0507498 - Sleeve valve device and shifting tool therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.1995
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.1996Change - applicantpublished on 06.03.1996 [1996/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HALLIBURTON COMPANY
P.O. Box 1431 Duncan
Oklahoma 73536 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/10]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON COMPANY
P.O. Box 1431 1015 Bois d'Arc
Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US
Former [1994/45]For all designated states
HALLIBURTON COMPANY
P.O. Box 1431
Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US
Former [1992/41]For all designated states
OTIS ENGINEERING CORPORATION
P.O. Box 819052
Dallas Texas 75381-9052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mashaw, Howard R., Jr.
1725 Southampton
Carrollton, Texas 75007 / US
02 / Hammett, Robert C.
3437 Heather Hill Drive
Garland, Texas 75044 / US
[1992/41]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/19]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Former [1992/41]Gura, Henry Alan
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date92302614.026.03.1992
[1992/41]
Priority number, dateUS1991067881201.04.1991         Original published format: US 678812
[1992/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0507498
Date:07.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.07.1992
ClassificationInternational:E21B34/14
[1992/41]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT [1992/41]
TitleGerman:Hülsenventil und Einstellgerät dafür[1992/41]
English:Sleeve valve device and shifting tool therefor[1992/41]
French:Dispositif avec soupape à manchon et outil-clé pour celui-ci[1992/41]
File destroyed:03.03.2001
Examination procedure11.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/16]
05.10.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1995/39]
18.05.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1995/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US4880059  ;
 [AD]US3874634  ;
 [AD]US4986362  ;
 [AD]US4896721