Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0511741

EP0511741 - Enhanced L1/L2 code channel for global positioning system receivers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.09.1998
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.10.1998 [1998/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Texas Instruments Incorporated
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas, Texas 75265 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/45]For all designated states
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED
13500 North Central Expressway
Dallas Texas 75265 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lapadula, Leonard, III
913 Bromwich
Garland, TX 75050 / US
02 / Scott, Hugh L.
860 Vindicator, Apt. No. 209
Colorado Spring, CO 80919 / US
03 / Volpi, John P.
2202 Colonial Place
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
[1992/45]
Representative(s)Nettleton, John Victor , et al
Abel & Imray
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/45]Nettleton, John Victor , et al
Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn
London, WC1V 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date92302791.630.03.1992
[1992/45]
Priority number, dateUS1991067770129.03.1991         Original published format: US 677701
[1992/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0511741
Date:04.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0511741
Date:05.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.1992
ClassificationInternational:G01S5/08, G01S11/08
[1992/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1992/45]
TitleGerman:L1/L2-Code-Frequenzband für Global-Positioning-System-Receiver[1992/45]
English:Enhanced L1/L2 code channel for global positioning system receivers[1992/45]
French:Bande de fréquence à code L1/L2 pour récepteur de système positionnement global[1992/45]
Examination procedure20.04.1993Examination requested  [1993/25]
23.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.04.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.1997Fee for grant paid
29.08.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.08.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/44]
Request for further processing for:25.08.1997Request for further processing filed
29.08.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.09.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
12.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4035663  (STODOLA KEVIN C);
 [Y]US4613977  (WONG ANDREW C C [GB], et al);
 [A]US4189622  (FOSHEE JAMES J [US]);
 [A]US4468793  (JOHNSON CHARLES R [US], et al)