Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0508689

EP0508689 - Secondary battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
Former [1992/42]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kitayama, Hiroyuki
Hijikami, Shinjo-cho
Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP
02 / Tanaka, Hideaki
507, 2-116-5, Daiwa-cho, Gakuen
Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP
03 / Mitate, Takehito
Hijikami, Shinjo-cho
Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP
04 / Yamada, Kazuo
Hijikami, Shinjo-cho
Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara-ken / JP
[1992/42]
Representative(s)West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]West, Alan Harry , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Former [1992/42]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date92302936.703.04.1992
[1992/42]
Priority number, dateJP1991007194605.04.1991         Original published format: JP 7194691
JP1991034166925.12.1991         Original published format: JP 34166991
[1992/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0508689
Date:14.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0508689
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.08.1992
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/40, H01M4/58, H01M4/40
[1992/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/42]
TitleGerman:Sekundärbatterie[1992/42]
English:Secondary battery[1992/42]
French:Batterie sécondaire[1992/42]
Examination procedure04.12.1992Examination requested  [1993/05]
13.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1999Date of oral proceedings
12.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.03.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1999Fee for grant paid
20.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
14.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP01014410  ;
 [AP]EP0434402  (SHARP KK [JP]);
 [A]EP0404578  (SHARP KK [JP]);
 [AD]EP0239410  (SHARP KK [JP])
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 10, March 6, 1989, Columbus, Ohio, USA YOSHIO M. et al. "The importance of the donor and acceptor concept in tailoring nonaqueous mixed electrolytes for lithium secondary batteries" page 229, column 1, abstract-no. 79 271k & Prog. Batteries Sol. Cells 1988, 7, 377-379,
 [AD]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 20, May 15, 1989, Columbus, Ohio, USA TAKAHASHI YUZURU et al. "Secondary batteries with lithium-carbon anodes" page 216, column 1, abstract-no. 176 729y & JP-A-01 014 410,