blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0515222

EP0515222 - Magneto-optical storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1992/48]Magneto-optical storage device and manufacturing method thereof
[1997/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.01.1998
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.01.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.02.1998 [1998/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/48]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohta, Kenji
3-9-17, Hirosedai, Kawai-cho
Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 636 / JP
02 / Takahashi, Akira
1-1-45-104, 5-chome, Suzaku
Nara-shi, Nara 631 / JP
03 / Nakajima, Junsaku
6-3-211, Saiwai-cho
Yamatotakada-shi, Nara 635 / JP
04 / Murakami, Yoshiteru
9-16-605, Ohata-cho
Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662 / JP
[1992/48]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/48]Brown, Kenneth Richard
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date92304682.522.05.1992
[1992/48]
Priority number, dateJP1991011885723.05.1991         Original published format: JP 11885791
JP1991011886623.05.1991         Original published format: JP 11886691
[1992/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0515222
Date:25.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0515222
Date:24.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0515222
Date:05.03.1997
Language:EN
[1997/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:G11B11/10
[1992/48]
CPC:
G11B11/10584 (EP); G11B11/10582 (EP); G11B11/10586 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/48]
TitleGerman:Magnetooptische Speichervorrichtung[1997/10]
English:Magneto-optical storage device[1997/10]
French:Dispositif de stockage magnétooptique[1997/10]
Former [1992/48]Magnetooptische Speichervorrichtung und deren Herstellungsverfahren
Former [1992/48]Magneto-optical storage device and manufacturing method thereof
Former [1992/48]Dispositif de stockage magnétooptique et son procédé de fabrication
Examination procedure07.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/31]
05.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.09.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.1996Fee for grant paid
23.10.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
09.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XP]JP04014641  ;
 [XP]JP03228238  ;
 [E]JP04243037  ;
 [E]JP04258829  ;
 [X]EP0304873  ;
 [X]EP0376375  ;
 [A]EP0367685
 [XP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 167 (P-1342)22 April 1992 & JP-A-04 014641 ( HITACHI LTD. ) 20 January 1992, & JP04014641 A 19920120
 [XP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 5 (P-1295)8 January 1992 & JP-A-03 228238 ( KURARAY CO. LTD. ) 9 October 1991, & JP03228238 A 19911009
 [E]  - JAPANESE PATENTS ABSTRACTS (UNEXAMINED) Section EI, Week 9241, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class T03, AN 92-337289 & JP-A-04 243037 (KURARAY CO. LTD.) 30 August 1992, & JP04243037 A 19920830
 [E]  - JAPANESE PATENTS ABSTRACTS (UNEXAMINED) Section EI, Week 9243, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class T03, AN 92-354884 & JP-A-04 258829 (SHARP K.K.) 14 September 1992, & JP04258829 A 19920914
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.