Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0519673

EP0519673 - Composition containing dioxabicyclo[3.3.0]octane derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUNTORY LIMITED
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8203 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
SUNTORY LIMITED
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP
Former [1992/52]For all designated states
SUNTORY LIMITED
1-40, Dojimahama 2-chome
Kita-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 530 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakabayashi, Ayako
25, Shimohanda-cho, Saiin, Ukyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP
02 / Kitagawa, Yoshinori
16-16-10, Futaba-cho
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP
03 / Akimoto, Kengo
15-25, Terada-cho
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP
04 / Sugano, Michihiro
5-38-23, Najima, Higashi-ku
Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka / JP
[1992/52]
Representative(s)Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/52]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date92305491.015.06.1992
[1992/52]
Priority number, dateJP1991014371515.06.1991         Original published format: JP 14371591
[1992/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0519673
Date:23.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0519673
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.1992
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/335, A61K31/34
[1992/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
Former [1992/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Arzneizusammensetzung auf Basis von Dioxabicyclo[3.3.0]octanderivaten[1992/52]
English:Composition containing dioxabicyclo[3.3.0]octane derivative[1992/52]
French:Composition à base de dérivés de dioxabicyclo[3.3.0]octane[1992/52]
Examination procedure26.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/17]
22.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.09.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.06.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2000Fee for grant paid
10.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Request for further processing for:10.09.1996Request for further processing filed
10.09.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.07.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
22.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP62172086  ;
 [Y]EP0409654  (SUNTORY LTD [JP]);
 [Y]EP0207735  (TAKEMOTO OIL & FAT CO LTD [JP])
 [Y]  - STN INTERNATIONAL INFORMATION SERVICES DATA BASE: CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 25, abstract no. 235163x, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 172 086 (NISSHIN OIL MILLS. LTD) 29-07-1987,