Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0520794

EP0520794 - Methods for detection of carcinoma metastases by nucleic acid amplification [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  06.04.2007
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4002 Basel / CH
For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
300 Lakeside Drive
22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/48]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4002 Basel / CH
For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
Former [1993/01]For all designated states
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
CH-4002 Basel / CH
For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Green, Mark R.
4335 Avalon Drive
San Diego, California 92103 / US
02 / Kawasaki, Ernest S.
2601 San Mateo Street
Richmond, California 94804 / US
03 / Sobol, Robert E.
5673 La Jolla Hermosa Avenue
La Jolla, California 92037 / US
[1993/01]
Representative(s)Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 J J Thomson Ave
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2005/08]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2004/01]Williams, Richard Andrew Norman , et al
Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [1993/01]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date92305862.225.06.1992
[1993/01]
Priority number, dateUS1991072006126.06.1991         Original published format: US 720061
[1993/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0520794
Date:30.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/53]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0520794
Date:26.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.1992
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[1993/01]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT [1993/01]
TitleGerman:Methoden zur Bestimmung von Krebsmetastasen mittels Nukleinsäuren-Amplifikation[1997/48]
English:Methods for detection of carcinoma metastases by nucleic acid amplification[1993/01]
French:Méthodes de détection de métastases d'un carcinome par amplification d'acides nucléiques[1993/01]
Former [1993/01]Methoden zur Feststellung von Krebsmetastasen durch Nukleinsäure-Amplifizierung
Examination procedure17.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/32]
06.06.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.05.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.08.1997Fee for grant paid
26.08.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.08.1998  02.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
van Someren, Petronella F. H. M.
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 02  25.08.1998  28.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Vysis Inc.
Downers Grove
Illinois 60615-5400 / US
Opponent's representative
Naylor, Kathryn May
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2008/34]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.1998  02.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M.
Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 02  25.08.1998  28.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Vysis Inc.
Downers Grove
Illinois 60615-5400 / US
Opponent's representative
Naylor, Kathryn May
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2006/16]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.1998  02.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M.
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
 02  25.08.1998  28.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Vysis Inc.
Downers Grove
Illinois 60615-5400 / US
Opponent's representative
Naylor, Kathryn May
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [2003/02]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.1998  02.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M.
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
 02  25.08.1998  28.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Vysis Inc.
Downers Grove
Illinois 60615-5400 / US
Opponent's representative
Ritter, Stephen David
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [1998/42]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.1998  02.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
van Gent, Marieke
N.V. Organon Postbus 20
5340 BH Oss / NL
 02  25.08.1998  28.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Vysis Inc.
Downers Grove
Illinois 60615-5400 / US
Opponent's representative
Ritter, Stephen David
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Former [1998/41]
Opponent(s)01  19.08.1998  02.09.1998  ADMISSIBLE
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL
Opponent's representative
van Gent, Marieke
N.V. Organon Postbus 20
5340 BH Oss / NL
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
14.09.1998No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
22.09.1998No. 02: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
28.10.1998Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.1999Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.07.2002Date of oral proceedings
16.08.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.08.2002Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
28.06.2006Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/19]
28.06.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition25.10.2002Appeal received No.  T1091/02
27.12.2002Statement of grounds filed
28.06.2006Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
28.06.2006Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
29.07.2003Date of oral proceedings
26.08.2003Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
20.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
23.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9002203
 [AP]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 17, April 27, 1992 Columbus, Ohio, USA P.S. GANLY et al. "PCR-based RFLP analysis allows geno- typing of the short arm of chromosome 3 in smalll biopsies from patients with lung cancer.", page 578, abstract-no. 171 228y