Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0524011

EP0524011 - Transverse electromagnetic mode resonator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.08.1998
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.09.1998 [1998/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/41]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1994/50]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP
Former [1993/03]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Uwano, Tomoki
5-4-409, Makinokitamachi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP
[1993/03]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/03]Brunner, Michael John , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date92306562.717.07.1992
[1993/03]
Priority number, dateJP1991017948119.07.1991         Original published format: JP 17948191
[1993/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0524011
Date:20.01.1993
Language:EN
[1993/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0524011
Date:12.01.1994
Language:EN
[1994/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0524011
Date:08.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1993
ClassificationInternational:H01P7/08, H01P7/10, H01P7/00
[1994/01]
Former International [1993/03]H01P7/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/03]
TitleGerman:Resonator für transversale elektromagnetische Schwingungsmode[1993/03]
English:Transverse electromagnetic mode resonator[1993/03]
French:Résonateur électromagnétique de mode transversal[1993/03]
Examination procedure06.08.1992Examination requested  [1993/03]
12.01.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.02.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.05.1997Fee for grant paid
02.05.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0154703  ;
 [A]EP0413211  ;
 [A]US4992763