EP0526212 - Method of forming isolated regions of oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton, TX 75006-5039 / US | [1999/08] |
Former [1993/05] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS, INC. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hodges, Robert 409 Sierra Drive Euless, Tarrant County, Texas 76040 / US | 02 /
Bryant, Frank 2125 Crestwood Denton, Denton County, Texas 76201 / US | [1993/05] | Representative(s) | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | [1993/05] | Application number, filing date | 92306967.8 | 30.07.1992 | [1993/05] | Priority number, date | US19910738580 | 31.07.1991 Original published format: US 738580 | [1993/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0526212 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0526212 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0526212 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/76, H01L21/32 | [1993/05] | CPC: |
H01L21/32 (EP,US);
Y10S148/015 (EP,US);
Y10S148/117 (EP,US);
Y10S257/905 (EP,US);
Y10S257/912 (EP,US);
Y10S257/914 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Isolationszonen aus Oxid | [1993/05] | English: | Method of forming isolated regions of oxide | [1993/05] | French: | Méthode pour former des régions d'isolation en oxide | [1993/05] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/23] | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 28.02.2001 | [2008/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]US4016007 (WADA YASUO, et al) [Y] 1,7,14 * claim 1 * * claims 2-4 * [X] 2,3; | [A]EP0388597 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,7 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP0111774 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-7,13,14 * figures 1-8; claims 1-10 * | [YX] - J.M. SUNG ET AL., "REVERSE L-SHAPE SEALED POLY-BUFFER LOCOS TECHNOLOGY", IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, NEW YORK US, vol. 11, no. 111, pages 549 - 551 [Y] 1,7,14 * page 549, column R, paragraph 1 - page 550, column L, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [X] 2-6,2-6 | [A] - M.RAMIN ER AL., "OXIDATION INHIBITING PROPERTIES OF Si3N4 PRODUCED BY ION OMPLANTATION", APPLIED PHYSICS, HEIDELBERG DE, vol. 22, pages 393 - 397 [A] 7-12 * page 393, column L, paragraph 2 - page 394, column R, paragraph 1; figures 1-4 * | [A] - J.M. SUNG ET AL., "CRAB-EYE FORMATION IN POLY.BUFFER LOCOS ISOLATION TECHNOLOGY", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, vol. 137, no. 7, pages 2350 - 2351 [A] 1,7,13 * the whole document * |