Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0528597

EP0528597 - Apparatus and methods for moving or copying objects using destination and source bins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1993/08]Apparatus and methods for moving/copying objects using destination and/or source bins
[1999/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.05.2001 [2001/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
2550 Garcia Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[1993/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Hemenway, Kathleen
312 Lexington Drive
Menlow Park, California 94025 / US
02 / Jerome, Mitchell I.
505 Fern Ridge Court
Sunnyvale, California 94087 / US
03 / Mullet, Kevin
1375 Montecitl Avenue, No.40
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
[1993/08]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]Wombwell, Francis
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date92307203.706.08.1992
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateUS1991074632816.08.1991         Original published format: US 746328
[1993/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0528597
Date:24.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0528597
Date:08.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528597
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP20.10.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/023, G06F3/033
[1993/46]
Former International [1993/08]G06F3/023
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1993/08]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bewegung oder Kopieren von Objekten mit Benutzung der Ziel- und Quellen-Einheiten[1999/33]
English:Apparatus and methods for moving or copying objects using destination and source bins[1999/33]
French:Dispositif et méthodes de transfert ou de copie d'objets utilisant les "conteneurs" de destination et source[1999/33]
Former [1993/08]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bewegung/Kopie von Objekten mit Benutzung der Ziel- und/oder Quellen-Einheiten
Former [1993/08]Apparatus and methods for moving/copying objects using destination and/or source bins
Former [1993/08]Dispositif et méthodes de transfert/copie d'objets utilisant les "conteneurs" de destination et/ou source
Examination procedure13.05.1994Examination requested  [1994/28]
24.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.06.1999Date of oral proceedings
05.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2000Fee for grant paid
17.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XP]EP0475870  (IBM [US]);
 [A]US4899136  (BEARD MARIAN H [US], et al)
 [A]  IEEE COMPUTER GRAPHICS AND APPLICATIONS vol. 8, no. 5, September 1988, NEW YORK US pages 65 - 84 MYERS 'A Taxonomy of Window Manager User Interfaces',
 [A]  IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 33, no. 6B, November 1990, NEW YORK US pages 256 - 257 'Window mini-icon',
Examination   IBM System Application Architecture, 'Common User Access - Advanced Interface Design Guide,' June 1989, pages 111-115,