blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0528613

EP0528613 - Powder sprayer with pneumatic powder supply system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.03.1998
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.03.1998No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.04.1998 [1998/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OXY-DRY CORPORATION
1331 W. Hamilton Parkway
Itasca, IL 60143 / US
[1993/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Uribe, Diego
365 Fox Hunt Trail
Barrington, Illinois 60010 / US
02 / Hantscho, Rolf
965 Manchester Court
Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US
03 / Kawalski, Frank
55 W. Kathleen Drive
Des Plaines, Illinois 60016 / US
[1993/08]
Representative(s)Spall, Christopher John, et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]Spall, Christopher John, et al
BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road
Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date92307293.810.08.1992
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateUS1991074311109.08.1991         Original published format: US 743111
[1993/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0528613
Date:24.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0528613
Date:18.08.1993
Language:EN
[1993/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528613
Date:07.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1993
ClassificationIPC:B41F23/06
[1993/08]
CPC:
B05C19/06 (EP,US); B05C19/04 (EP,US); B41F23/06 (EP,US);
G01F11/24 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1993/08]
TitleGerman:Pulverspritzvorrichtung mit einem pneumatischen Pulverzufuhrsystem[1993/08]
English:Powder sprayer with pneumatic powder supply system[1993/08]
French:Pulvérisateur de poudre avec un système d'alimentation en poudre pneumatique[1993/08]
Examination procedure01.12.1992Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
06.01.1993Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
17.02.1994Examination requested  [1994/16]
21.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.10.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.1997Fee for grant paid
15.01.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.02.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP5981175  ;
 [Y]JP60127156  ;
 [Y]WO9002698  (OXY DRY CORP [US]);
 [Y]US3554164  (WEST JAMES A);
 [A]US4154370  (HAGEN KENNETH L [US], et al)
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 191 (M-322)(1628) 4 September 1984 & JP-A-59 81 175 ( HOOMEN KOGYO ) 10 May 1984, & JP5981175 A 19840510
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 286 (M-429)(2009) 13 November 1985 & JP-A-60 127 156 ( MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO ) 6 July 1985, & JP60127156 A 19850706
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.