Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0534782

EP0534782 - Implantable medical device enclosure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.1997
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.1997Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 07.01.1998 [1998/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E. Minneapolis
Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/13]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
7000 Central Avenue N.E.
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-3576 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Byland, James
1527 Wynne Avenue
St. Paul, Minnesota 55108 / US
02 / Defranco, Michael
14400 Raven Street N.W.
Andover, Minnesota 55304 / US
03 / Sikorski, James
8340 Sunnyside Road NE
Moundview, Minnesota 55112 / US
04 / Thompson, David
1660 Onondaga Street N.E.
Fridley, Minnesota 55432 / US
05 / Hooper, William
8820 - 27th Street Court North
Lake Elmo, Minnesota 55042 / US
[1993/13]
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Kerry John , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/13]Tomlinson, Kerry John , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date92308764.725.09.1992
[1993/13]
Priority number, dateUS1991076660226.09.1991         Original published format: US 766602
[1993/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0534782
Date:31.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1992
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/375, A61N1/36
[1993/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1993/13]
TitleGerman:Gehäuse für implantierbare medizinische Vorrichtung[1993/13]
English:Implantable medical device enclosure[1993/13]
French:Boîtier de dispositif médical implantable[1993/13]
Examination procedure28.10.1993Examination requested  [1993/52]
04.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.1996Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
10.08.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.01.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.1997Fee for grant paid
17.04.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.1997Application withdrawn by applicant  [1998/02]
Request for further processing for:10.08.1996Request for further processing filed
10.08.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.09.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.11.1993M01   Fee paid on   28.10.1993
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.199706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS52111297  (CIT ALCATEL, et al);
 [A]FR2387029  (CORDIS CORP [US]);
 [A]US4010760  (KRASKA ROBERT E, et al);
 [AD]US4314562  (WARE LYLE A)