Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0539219


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.05.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.07.2000 [2000/28]
04.06.1999 (Expected) grant published on  21.07.1999 [1999/29]
28.04.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
16.01.1999 Communication of intention to grant
16.01.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.01.1999 Communication of intention to grant
05.11.1998 Renewal fee
04.09.1998 Communication of intention to grant
17.08.1998 Examination report or reply
17.04.1998 First examination report
14.04.1998 Examination report or reply
07.11.1997 Renewal fee
06.11.1996 Renewal fee
02.02.1996 Request for examination filed published on  20.03.1996 [1996/12]
12.01.1996 Publication of search report published on  28.02.1996 [1996/09]
12.03.1993 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.04.1993 [1993/17]