blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0539219
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2771369BGlobal Dossier 02.07.1998B2
JPH05122414 18.05.1993A
Priority number Date
JP30536391 24.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0539219Global Dossier 21.07.1999B1
EP0539219 28.02.1996A3
EP0539219 28.04.1993A2
Priority number Date
JP30536391 24.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69229620D 26.08.1999D1
Priority number Date
JP30536391 24.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69229620T 09.03.2000T2
Priority number Date
JP30536391 24.10.1991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5323398 21.06.1994A
Priority number Date
JP30536391 24.10.1991