Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0539219

EP0539219 - Speech signal coding and decoding system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.05.2000
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.05.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.07.2000 [2000/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1999/29]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1993/17]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Wake, Yasuhiro
c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Usuki, Katsunori
c/o NEC Eng.Ltd., 20-4, Nishishinbashi 3-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1993/17]
Representative(s)Orchard, Oliver John
JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn
London WC1V 7PZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/17]Orchard, Oliver John
JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn
London WC1V 7PZ / GB
Application number, filing date92309733.123.10.1992
[1993/17]
Priority number, dateJP1991030536324.10.1991         Original published format: JP 30536391
[1993/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0539219
Date:28.04.1993
Language:EN
[1993/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0539219
Date:28.02.1996
[1996/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0539219
Date:21.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.1996
ClassificationInternational:H04M11/06, H04N1/32
[1993/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/17]
TitleGerman:System zur Sprachkodierung und -dekodierung[1993/17]
English:Speech signal coding and decoding system[1993/17]
French:Système de codage et de décodage de la parole[1993/17]
Examination procedure19.01.1996Examination requested  [1996/12]
16.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
07.01.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
20.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.04.1999Fee for grant paid
19.04.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
26.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5036513  (GREENBLATT RICHARD D [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 25; figures 1-3 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 32 * * column 6, line 18 - line 59 * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 61 *;
 [Y]US4813040  (FUTATO STEVEN P [US]) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 15 * * column 4, line 8 - line 42 *;
 [A]EP0339467  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  S. CASALE ET AL., "Statistical Voice/high-speed data multiplexing on a 64 kbit/s channel", PHOENIX CONFERENCE ON COMPUTERS AND COMMUNICATIONS 1991, SCOTTSDALE , US, pages 459 - 464, XP000299078 [A] 1-3 * page 459, column R, line 29 - page 460, column R, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PCCC.1991.113849