Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0541288

EP0541288 - Circuit module redundacy architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.1999
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.05.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.06.1999 [1999/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hsu, Fu-Chieh
21775 Congress Hall Lane Saratoga
California 95070 / US
For all designated states
Leung, Wingyu
21775 Congress Hall Lane Saratoga
California 95070 / US
[N/P]
Former [1993/19]For all designated states
Hsu, Fu-Chieh
21775 Congress Hall Lane
Saratoga, California 95070 / US
For all designated states
Leung, Wingyu
21775 Congress Hall Lane
Saratoga, California 95070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1993/19]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/19]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date92309866.928.10.1992
[1993/19]
Priority number, dateUS1991078798405.11.1991         Original published format: US 787984
US1992086541008.04.1992         Original published format: US 865410
[1993/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0541288
Date:12.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0541288
Date:22.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0541288
Date:08.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/20
[1993/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/19]
TitleGerman:Redundanzarchitektur für Schaltungsmodul[1993/19]
English:Circuit module redundacy architecture[1993/19]
French:Architecture à redondance pour module de circuit[1993/19]
Examination procedure15.04.1994Examination requested  [1994/24]
26.09.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.01.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.02.1998Fee for grant paid
19.02.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.04.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26]
Request for further processing for:09.12.1997Request for further processing filed
09.12.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.01.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
16.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[DA]US4007452  (HOFF) [DA] 1,6-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 26 - line 65 *;
 [A]US3803562  (HUNTER) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 17, line 29 - column 18, line 64 *;
 [A]EP0178949  (FUJITSU) [A] 1-13 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS59212962  ;
 [A]US3983537  (PARSONS ET AL) [A] 18-20 * column A; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4329685  (MAHON ET AL) [A] 25-29 * column A; figures 4A,5A-5C *;
 [A]EP0389203  (FUJITSU) [A] 30,31 * page 2, line 46 - page 3, line 53 * * figure 2 *;
 [E]US5204836  (REED) [E] 14,15,22 * column A; figure 4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850412), vol. 9, no. 83, Database accession no. (P - 348)<1806> , & JP59212962 A 00000000 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 14,15,22 * abstract *