blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0542516

EP0542516 - Focus control device for optical pickup [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.01.1999
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.1999 [1999/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/20]For all designated states
PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORPORATION
No. 4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murao, Noriaki, c/o Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Maeda, Takanori, /o Pioneer Electronic Corp.
Tokorozawa Works, No. 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[1993/20]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/20]Brunner, Michael John, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date92310276.811.11.1992
[1993/20]
Priority number, dateJP1991030070915.11.1991         Original published format: JP 30070991
[1993/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0542516
Date:19.05.1993
Language:EN
[1993/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0542516
Date:01.12.1993
Language:EN
[1993/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0542516
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1993
ClassificationIPC:G11B7/09, G11B7/13
[1993/20]
CPC:
G11B7/0912 (EP,US); G11B7/127 (EP,US); G11B7/13 (EP,US);
G11B7/1365 (EP,US); G11B7/1367 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1993/20]
TitleGerman:Fokussierregelungsvorrichtung für optische Abtasteinheit[1993/20]
English:Focus control device for optical pickup[1993/20]
French:Dispositif de commande de focalisation pour lecteur optique[1993/20]
Examination procedure24.05.1994Examination requested  [1994/30]
28.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.09.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.1997Fee for grant paid
05.12.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0292107  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]);
 [E]EP0543557  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.