blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0546690


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.01.1999 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.02.1999 [1999/08]
16.01.1998 (Expected) grant published on  04.03.1998 [1998/10]
19.11.1997 Renewal fee
25.10.1997 Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.07.1997 Communication of intention to grant
24.07.1997 Communication of intention to grant a patent
02.04.1997 Communication of intention to grant
19.11.1996 Renewal fee
02.03.1996 Examination report or reply
10.01.1996 Examination report or reply
18.11.1993 First examination report
21.10.1993 Request for examination filed published on  08.12.1993 [1993/49]
29.04.1993 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.06.1993 [1993/24]