Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0546690

EP0546690 - Catalyst components for polymerization of olefins [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.1999
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.02.1999 [1999/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON OIL CO. LTD.
3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/24]For all designated states
NIPPON OIL CO. LTD.
3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kataoka, Naoki
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Numao, Yosuke
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Seki, Takashi
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
04 / Tajima, Yoshio
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
05 / Matsuura, Kazuo
8, Chidori-cho, Naka-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1993/24]
Representative(s)Ablewhite, Alan James , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/24]Ablewhite, Alan James , et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date92310315.412.11.1992
[1993/24]
Priority number, dateJP1991032384812.11.1991         Original published format: JP 32384891
JP1991032384912.11.1991         Original published format: JP 32384991
[1993/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0546690
Date:16.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0546690
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.1993
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/642, C08F10/00
[1993/24]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1993/24]
TitleGerman:Katalysatorbestandteile für Olefinpolymerisation[1993/24]
English:Catalyst components for polymerization of olefins[1993/24]
French:Composants de catalyseur pour polymérisation d'oléfines[1993/24]
Examination procedure08.10.1993Examination requested  [1993/49]
22.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.02.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.05.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
28.07.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.10.1997Fee for grant paid
16.10.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.12.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0260130  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]);
 [X]EP0447071  (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al);
 [A]DE1720785  (HOECHST AG [DE]);
 [A]US5021382  (MALPASS JR GERALD D [CA])