Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0544531

EP0544531 - Process for the preparation of epsilon-caprolactam by Deckamnn-rearrangement in the phase in the presence of a zeolite catalyst and nitrogen-containing compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0041 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP
Former [1996/38]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP
Former [1993/22]For all designated states
SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED
5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ichihashi, Hiroshi
2-10-16-102, Hieitsuji
Ootsu-shi, Shiga 520-01 / JP
02 / Kajikuri, Hiroshi
1-2-40, Hirata
Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP
03 / Kitamura, Masaru
1-9-1-402, Tamagawa
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
04 / Tasaka, Eiji
29 L-302, Shin-ashiyakami
Suita-shi, Osaka 565 / JP
[1993/22]
Representative(s)Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas , et al
KILBURN & STRODE 20 Red Lion Street
London, WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1993/22]Kearney, Kevin David Nicholas , et al
KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street
London, WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date92310819.526.11.1992
[1993/22]
Priority number, dateJP1991031249227.11.1991         Original published format: JP 31249291
JP1991031249327.11.1991         Original published format: JP 31249391
[1993/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0544531
Date:02.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0544531
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.1993
ClassificationInternational:C07D201/04, B01J29/04
[1993/22]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1993/22]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epsilon-Caprolactam durch Beckmann-Umlagerung in der Gasphase in Gegenwart eines Zeolithkatalysators und einer stickstoffhaltigen Verbindung[1999/27]
English:Process for the preparation of epsilon-caprolactam by Deckamnn-rearrangement in the phase in the presence of a zeolite catalyst and nitrogen-containing compounds[1993/22]
French:Procédé pour la préparation d'epsilon-caprolactame par transposition de Beckmann en phase gazeuse et en présence d'un catalysateur contenant une zéolithe et en présence d'un composé azoté[1993/22]
Former [1993/22]Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epsilon-Caprolactam durch Beckmann-Umlagerung in der Gasphase in der Gegenwart eines Zeolithkatalysators und einer stickstoffhaltigen Verbindung
Examination procedure13.10.1993Examination requested  [1993/50]
19.09.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.08.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.09.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.1999Fee for grant paid
21.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
11.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0236092  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [A]EP0234088  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [Y]EP0369364  (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]);
 [YP]EP0494535  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [Y]DE1545789  (BAYER AG);
 [Y]EP0388070  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al);
 [Y]EP0380364  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]);
 [Y]EP0242960  (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP])
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104 Columbus, Ohio, US; BURGUET, M. C. ET AL.,
by applicantJPH02275850
 JPH02250866
 EP0494535
 EP0380364