blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0504034

EP0504034 - Heat exchanger with connected water boxes for cars [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.08.1999
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR
8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière
78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/38]For all designated states
VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR
8, rue Louis-Lormand La Verrière
F-78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Boquel, Dany
27, rue des Acacias
F-78660 Ablis / FR
02 / Levy, Bernard
191, rue Armand Silvestre
F-92400 Courbevoie / FR
03 / Golm, Norman
33, Boulevard Lefebvre
F-75015 Paris / FR
[1992/38]
Representative(s)Gamonal, Didier, et al
Valeo Management Services
Propriété Industrielle
2 Rue Andrée Boulle
B.P. 150
94004 Créteil / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/45]Gamonal, Didier, et al
Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150
F-94004 Créteil / FR
Former [1992/38]Gamonal, Didier
Valeo Management Services, Service Propriété Industrielle, "Le Triangle", 15, rue des Rosiers
F-93585 Saint-Ouen Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date92400612.510.03.1992
[1992/38]
Priority number, dateFR1991000298112.03.1991         Original published format: FR 9102981
[1992/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0504034
Date:16.09.1992
Language:FR
[1992/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0504034
Date:04.01.1995
Language:FR
[1995/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.1992
ClassificationIPC:F28F9/00
[1992/38]
CPC:
F28F9/001 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT,   SE [1992/38]
TitleGerman:Wärmetauscher mit verbundenen Wasserkästen für Fahrzeuge[1992/38]
English:Heat exchanger with connected water boxes for cars[1992/38]
French:Echangeur de chaleur à boîtes à eau reliées pour véhicules automobiles[1992/38]
Examination procedure30.01.1993Examination requested  [1993/13]
01.02.1993Request for accelerated examination filed
05.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.04.1993Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
30.07.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.1994Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.05.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1994Fee for grant paid
24.09.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.09.1995  18.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Längerer & Reich GmbH
Echterdingerstr. 57
D-70794 Filderstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Wolter, Klaus-Dietrich
Modine Europe GmbH
Patentabteilung
70790 Filderstadt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/48]
Opponent(s)01  23.09.1995  18.10.1995  ADMISSIBLE
Längerer & Reich GmbH
Echterdingerstr. 57
D-70794 Filderstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
Wolter, Klaus-Dietrich
Längerer & Reich GmbH
D-70790 Filderstadt / DE
Former [1995/46]
Opponent(s)01  23.09.1995   
Längerer & Reich GmbH
Echterdingerstr. 57
D-70794 Filderstadt / DE
10.10.1995No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
12.10.1995No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
07.11.1995Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.03.1996Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.02.1997Date of oral proceedings
11.04.1997Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.03.1999Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/40]
09.03.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition21.05.1997Appeal received No.  T0560/97
11.07.1997Statement of grounds filed
09.03.1999Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
09.03.1999Date of oral proceedings
19.03.1999Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:06.05.1994Request for further processing filed
06.05.1994Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.05.1994Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP62142996  ;
 [A]GB2096303  (FORD MOTOR CO);
 [AD]EP0115795  (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]);
 [A]DE3403762  (FESTO KG [DE]);
 [A]EP0256913  (VALEO [FR])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 368 (M-647)2 Décembre 1987 & JP-A-62 142 996 ( SHOWA ALUM CORP ) 26 Juin 1987, & JP62142996 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.