Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0519819

EP0519819 - Composition for use to reduce hair loss and to induce and stimulate its growth, containing derivatives of 2,4,6-triaminopyrimidin-N-oxide and the new derivatives of 2,4,6-triaminopyrimidin-N-oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.1996
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.12.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 12.02.2003  [2003/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1992/52]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
F-75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Hocquaux, Michel
70, rue du Rendez-vous
F-75012 Paris / FR
02 / Bakkar, Khalid
20 Place Jacques Prévert
F-93270 Sevran / FR
03 / Galey, Jean-Baptiste
20, rue Lacépède
F-75005 Paris / FR
04 / Terranova, Eric
60, rue Maurice Bokanowski
F-92600 Asnières / FR
[1992/52]
Representative(s)Casalonga, Axel , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/52]Casalonga, Axel , et al
BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8
D-80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date92401689.217.06.1992
[1992/52]
Priority number, dateFR1991000759120.06.1991         Original published format: FR 9107591
[1992/52]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0519819
Date:23.12.1992
Language:FR
[1992/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0519819
Date:19.07.1995
Language:FR
[1995/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.1992
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06, C07D239/50
[1992/52]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1992/52]
TitleGerman:2,4,6-Triaminopyrimidin-N-Oxidderivate enthaltende Zusammensetzungen zur Verwendung beim Vermindern des Haarausfalles sowie zum Auslösen und Anregen des Haarwuchses und neue 2,4,6-Triaminopyrimidin-N-Oxidderivate[1992/52]
English:Composition for use to reduce hair loss and to induce and stimulate its growth, containing derivatives of 2,4,6-triaminopyrimidin-N-oxide and the new derivatives of 2,4,6-triaminopyrimidin-N-oxide[1992/52]
French:Composition pour freiner la chute des cheveux et pour induire et stimuler leur croissance à base de dérivés de pyrimidines N-oxyde trisubstitués en position 2,4 et 6 par une fonction amine, et nouveaux composés pyrimidines N-oxyde[1992/52]
Examination procedure01.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/30]
30.09.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.12.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.1995Fee for grant paid
23.02.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.04.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
17.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.07.1995
DK19.07.1995
GR19.07.1995
NL19.07.1995
PT19.10.1995
SE19.10.1995
[2003/07]
Former [2000/05]AT19.07.1995
DK19.07.1995
GR19.07.1995
PT19.10.1995
SE19.10.1995
Former [1998/15]AT19.07.1995
DK19.07.1995
PT19.10.1995
SE19.10.1995
Former [1998/14]AT19.07.1995
PT19.10.1995
SE19.10.1995
Former [1996/14]AT19.07.1995
SE19.10.1995
Former [1996/11]SE19.10.1995
Documents cited:Search[AD]US4308271  (DEGEETER MELVIN J, et al);
 [AD]US4287338  (MCCALL JOHN M);
 [A]WO8604231  (UPJOHN CO [US]);
 [A]WO8600616  (BAZZANO GAIL SANSONE);
 [A]EP0420707  (OREAL [FR])