blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0521756

EP0521756 - Automatic air-conditioning device for automotive vehicle interior [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.03.1996
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.1996Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.05.1996 [1996/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT
75, Avenue de la Grande Armée
75116 Paris / FR
For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES CITROEN
62, Boulevard Victor Hugo
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT
75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée
F-75116 Paris / FR
For all designated states
AUTOMOBILES CITROEN
62, Boulevard Victor Hugo
F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Baur, Michel
5, Rue H. Raboudui
F-78140 Velizy / FR
[1993/01]
Representative(s)Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al
Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/01]Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al
Cabinet Z. Weinstein 20, Avenue de Friedland
F-75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date92401807.025.06.1992
[1993/01]
Priority number, dateFR1991000831803.07.1991         Original published format: FR 9108318
[1993/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0521756
Date:07.01.1993
Language:FR
[1993/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.1992
ClassificationIPC:B60H1/00
[1993/01]
CPC:
B60H1/00864 (EP,US); B60H1/00735 (EP,US); B60H1/00971 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1993/01]
TitleGerman:Selbsttätige Vorrichtung zur Frischluftregulierung eines Wageninneren[1993/01]
English:Automatic air-conditioning device for automotive vehicle interior[1993/01]
French:Dispositif automatique de climatisation de l'habitacle d'un véhicule automobile[1993/01]
File destroyed:20.04.2002
Examination procedure05.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/35]
26.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.1995Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1996/20]
20.12.1995Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [1996/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4562954  (KAJITA SHUNSUKE [JP]);
 [A]FR2561179  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]US4429733  (HARA TOSHIZO [JP], et al);
 [A]FR2437312  (RENAULT)
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 18 (M-660)20 January 1988
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 96 (M-20)(578) 11 July 1980
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.