blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0528702

EP0528702 - Imaging system with integrated wear measurement of his optical elements working in transmission and optronic imaging equipment comprising such an imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.1996
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.1996No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.08.1996 [1996/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON-CSF
173, Boulevard Haussmann
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1994/07]For all designated states
THOMSON-CSF
173, Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
Former [1993/08]For all designated states
THOMSON-CSF
173, Boulevard Haussmann
F-75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Pepin, Christian
THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67
F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR
02 / Bourgain, Jean-Louis
THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67
F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR
[1993/08]
Representative(s)Lincot, Georges, et al
Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, Département Brevets, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende
94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1993/08]Lincot, Georges, et al
THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud
F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date92402011.810.07.1992
[1993/08]
Priority number, dateFR1991000927623.07.1991         Original published format: FR 9109276
[1993/08]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0528702
Date:24.02.1993
Language:FR
[1993/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0528702
Date:30.08.1995
Language:FR
[1995/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.01.1993
ClassificationIPC:G01M11/00
[1993/08]
CPC:
G01M11/00 (EP,US); H04N23/23 (EP); H04N5/33 (US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1993/08]
TitleGerman:Abbildungssystem mit integrierter Abnutzungsmessung der in Transmission arbeitenden optischen Elemente und optronische Abbildungseinrichtung, bestehend aus solch einem Abbildungssystem[1993/08]
English:Imaging system with integrated wear measurement of his optical elements working in transmission and optronic imaging equipment comprising such an imaging system[1993/08]
French:Système d'imagerie à mesure intégrée de l'usure de ses éléments optiques travaillant en transmission, et équipment optronique d'imagerie comportant un tel système d'imagerie[1993/08]
Examination procedure08.05.1993Examination requested  [1993/27]
23.06.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.01.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.04.1995Fee for grant paid
29.04.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.05.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP58118943  ;
 [A]JP57172222  ;
 [Y]FR2134833  (MATRA ENGINS);
 [A]US3743427  (WEISER S);
 [A]GB1381873  (SIRA INSTITUTE);
 [Y]US3912396  (HARTMANN RUDOLF);
 [A]US4110046  (BAKER LIONEL RICHARD, et al);
 [A]DE3439578  (PENTACON DRESDEN VEB [DD])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.