Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0526439

EP0526439 - CDMA substractive demodulator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.12.1998
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 29.07.2009  [2009/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
15 East Midland Avenue Paramus
New Jersey 07652 / US
[N/P]
Former [1996/10]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
15 East Midland Avenue
Paramus New Jersey 07652 / US
Former [1993/05]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
15 East Midland Avenue
Paramus, New Jersey 07652 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dent, Paul Wilkinson
Apartment 201 F, Hyde Park Cary Court
Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US
[1993/05]
Representative(s)Lövgren, Tage , et al
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson
Corporate IP & Licensing
126 25 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Lövgren, Tage , et al
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson Corporate IP & Licensing
126 25 Stockholm / SE
Former [1993/05]Lövgren, Tage , et al
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson Patent and Trademark Department
S-126 25 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date92850183.229.07.1992
[1993/05]
Priority number, dateUS1991073944602.08.1991         Original published format: US 739446
[1993/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0526439
Date:03.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0526439
Date:11.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1992
ClassificationInternational:H04J13/00
[1993/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1993/05]
TitleGerman:Subtraktive Kodedivisionsdemodulationsschaltung[1993/05]
English:CDMA substractive demodulator[1993/05]
French:Démodulation soustractive de signaux CDMA[1993/05]
Examination procedure16.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/34]
12.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.08.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.1997Fee for grant paid
20.10.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.11.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1999/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US4134071  (OHNSORGE HORST);
 [A]US4470138  (GUTLEBER FRANK S [US])
 [A]  TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATION ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, SECTION E71 no. 3, 1 March 1988, TOKYO JP pages 224 - 231 TATSURO MASAMURA 'Spread spectrum multiple access system with intrasystem interference cancellation.',
 [A]  PROCEEDING IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE vol. 1, 28 November 1988, HOLLYWOOD (US) pages 556 - 560 MAHESH K. VARANASI ET AL. 'An iterative detector for asynchronous spread-spectrum multiple-access systems.',
 [A]  PROCEEDINGS IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE vol. 1, 15 November 1987, TOKYO (JP) pages 630 - 634 RYUJI KOHNO ET AL. 'Adaptive cancellation of interference in direct-sequence spread-spectrum multiple access systems',
ExaminationEP0491668
    HOLLYWOOD (US) pages 556 - 560 MAHESH K. VARANASI ET AL. 'An iterative detector for asynchronous spread-spectrum multiple-access systems.',