Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0533644

EP0533644 - Breathing circuit and heat and moisture exchanger therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.1997
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LOUIS GIBECK AB
Box 711
194 27 Upplands-Väsby / SE
[1996/47]
Former [1993/12]For all designated states
GIBECK RESPIRATION AB
Box 711
S-194 27 Upplands Väsby / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Lambert, Hans
Lill-Jans Plan 5
S-114 25 Stockholm / SE
[1993/12]
Representative(s)Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar , et al
L.A. Groth & Co. KB
Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [1996/49]Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar , et al
L.A. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Former [1993/12]Westerlund, Christer , et al
L.A. Groth & Co Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 6107
S-102 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date92850221.015.09.1992
[1993/12]
Priority number, dateSE1991000273120.09.1991         Original published format: SE 9102731
[1993/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0533644
Date:24.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0533644
Date:23.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0533644
Date:04.12.1996
Language:EN
[1996/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/10
[1993/12]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1993/12]
TitleGerman:Atmungskreislauf sowie Wärme-Feuchtigkeitsaustauscher dafür[1993/12]
English:Breathing circuit and heat and moisture exchanger therefor[1993/12]
French:Circuit patient et échangeur d'humidité-chaleur[1993/12]
Examination procedure08.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/05]
17.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.09.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.04.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.1996Fee for grant paid
15.07.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.1997No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.12.1996
ES04.12.1996
FR04.12.1996
IT04.12.1996
LI04.12.1996
NL04.12.1996
SE04.03.1997
DE05.03.1997
[2006/14]
Former [2003/07]CH04.12.1996
ES04.12.1996
IT04.12.1996
LI04.12.1996
NL04.12.1996
SE04.03.1997
DE05.03.1997
FR30.04.1997
Former [2002/25]CH04.12.1996
ES04.12.1996
IT04.12.1996
LI04.12.1996
SE04.03.1997
DE05.03.1997
FR30.04.1997
Former [1999/42]CH04.12.1996
IT04.12.1996
LI04.12.1996
SE04.03.1997
DE05.03.1997
FR30.04.1997
Former [1998/11]CH04.12.1996
LI04.12.1996
SE04.03.1997
DE05.03.1997
FR30.04.1997
Former [1998/04]CH04.12.1996
LI04.12.1996
DE05.03.1997
FR30.04.1997
Former [1997/44]DE05.03.1997
FR30.04.1997
Former [1997/29]DE05.03.1997
Documents cited:Search[A]FR1121482  ;
 [A]EP0265163  ;
 [A]US4320754