Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0513304

EP0513304 - COMPOSITION OF AN ETHYLENE/CARBON MONOXIDE COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/20]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Former [1992/47]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / DE HAAS, Jacob, Leendert
Groot Berchem 12
NL-6235 BL Meerssen / NL
02 / REID, Valerie, Melville, Chrystie
Observantenweg 75
NL-6212 EP Maastricht / NL
[1992/47]
Application number, filing date92900417.404.12.1991
[1992/47]
WO1991NL00248
Priority number, dateNL1990000266605.12.1990         Original published format: NL 9002666
[1992/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9210524
Date:25.06.1992
Language:EN
[1992/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0513304
Date:19.11.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992
[1992/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0513304
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.1992
ClassificationInternational:C08G67/02, C08K5/16, C08K5/02, C08K5/04, C08L73/00
[1992/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1992/47]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS ÄTHYLEN-KOHLENMONOXID-COPOLYMEREN[1992/47]
English:COMPOSITION OF AN ETHYLENE/CARBON MONOXIDE COPOLYMER[1992/47]
French:COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMERE ETHYLENE-MONOXYDE DE CARBONE[1992/47]
Entry into regional phase01.09.1992National basic fee paid 
01.09.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
01.09.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.09.1992Examination requested  [1992/47]
08.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.04.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
09.06.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2000Fee for grant paid
18.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Request for further processing for:09.06.1997Request for further processing filed
09.06.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.06.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
08.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
04.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
08.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]US4795774
 [X]EP0326223
 [X]WO9014453
 [A]FR2292007
 [A]US4885318
 [A]US4293473
 [A]EP0360358
 [A]EP0326224