Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0514552

EP0514552 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOLID-STATE ELECTROLYTIC FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2001
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.05.2001 [2001/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YUASA CORPORATION
6-6, Josai-cho Takatsuki-shi
Osaka 569 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1993/35]For all designated states
YUASA CORPORATION
6-6, Josai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
Former [1992/48]For all designated states
YUASA BATTERY CO., LTD.
6-6, Johsai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / OKUYAMA, Ryoichi
Yuasa Battery Co., Ltd., 6-6, Josai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
02 / NOMURA, Eiichi
Yuasa Battery Co., Ltd., 6-6, Josai-cho
Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP
[1992/48]
Representative(s)Linn, Samuel Jonathan , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/21]Linn, Samuel Jonathan , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1992/48]Barker, Rosemary Anne
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date92900502.309.12.1991
[1992/48]
WO1991JP01701
Priority number, dateJP1990040999710.12.1990         Original published format: JP 40999790
JP1990041095914.12.1990         Original published format: JP 41095990
JP1990041140217.12.1990         Original published format: JP 41140290
JP1990041201418.12.1990         Original published format: JP 41201490
JP1991002953929.01.1991         Original published format: JP 2953991
JP1991002954029.01.1991         Original published format: JP 2954091
JP1991004436715.02.1991         Original published format: JP 4436791
JP1991005936828.02.1991         Original published format: JP 5936891
JP1991005936928.02.1991         Original published format: JP 5936991
JP1991007235211.03.1991         Original published format: JP 7235291
JP1991008326023.03.1991         Original published format: JP 8326091
JP1991008326123.03.1991         Original published format: JP 8326191
JP1991020868424.07.1991         Original published format: JP 20868491
JP1991020868524.07.1991         Original published format: JP 20868591
JP1991024046626.08.1991         Original published format: JP 24046691
JP1991027005520.09.1991         Original published format: JP 27005591
JP1991028403103.10.1991         Original published format: JP 28403191
JP1991028914807.10.1991         Original published format: JP 28914891
[1992/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9210862
Date:25.06.1992
Language:EN
[1992/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0514552
Date:25.11.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992
[1992/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0514552
Date:17.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP25.06.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.1993
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/02, H01M8/12
[1992/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1992/50]
Former [1992/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ELEKTROLYTISCHER FESTSTOFFZELLE[1992/48]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SOLID-STATE ELECTROLYTIC FUEL CELL[1992/48]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE ELECTROLYTIQUE A L'ETAT SOLIDE[1992/48]
Entry into regional phase31.07.1992Translation filed 
31.08.1992National basic fee paid 
31.08.1992Search fee paid 
31.08.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.1992Examination requested  [1992/53]
22.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.05.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.1999Fee for grant paid
30.07.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19]
Request for further processing for:25.11.1996Request for further processing filed
25.11.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.12.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
21.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[A]JP01110904  ;
 [A]FR1375469  (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE);
 [A]DE1179852  (ZIRCONIUM CORP OF AMERICA);
 [A]US4957673  (SCHROEDER JAMES E [US], et al);
 [A]US3377203  (HANS-HEINRICH MOBIUS, et al);
 [A]EP0134136  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 334 (M-855)(3682) 27 July 1989 & JP-A-01 110 904 ( ISUZU MOTORS LTD ) 27 April 1989,
International search[Y]JPH0193065  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [Y]JPS62268063  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [P]JPH0381972  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [P]JPH03101065  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD);
 [Y]JPS4976038  ;
 [Y]JPS647475  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD);
 [Y]JPS61216258  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP)