blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0563201

EP0563201 - GENETICALLY ENGINEERED MODIFICATION OF POTATO TO FORM AMYLOSE-TYPE STARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BASF Plant Science GmbH
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[2003/46]
Former [1993/40]For all designated states
AMYLOGENE HB
c/o Svalöf AB
S-268 81 Svalöv / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HOFVANDER, Per
Doppinggränd 8
S-230 11 Falsterbo / SE
02 / PERSSON, Per, T.
Travgatan 9
S-291 65 Kristianstad / SE
03 / TALLBERG, Anneli
Drapavägen 69
S-223 74 Lund / SE
04 / WIKSTRÖM, Olle
Wasagatan 1
S-291 53 Kristianstad / SE
[1993/40]
Representative(s)Bieberbach, Andreas, et al
BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX / K - C 6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]Bieberbach, Andreas, Dr., et al
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung GVX - C6
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Former [1993/40]Wiklund, Ingrid Helena, et al
AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117
S-200 71 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date92901887.720.12.1991
[1993/40]
WO1991SE00891
Priority number, dateSE1990000409521.12.1990         Original published format: SE 9004095
[1993/40]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9211375
Date:09.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0563201
Date:06.10.1993
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1993/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE09.07.1992
ClassificationIPC:C12N15/56, C12N9/44, A01H5/00
[1993/40]
CPC:
C12N9/107 (EP); C12N15/8245 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1993/40]
TitleGerman:GENTECHNOLOGISCHE MODIFIKATION DER KARTOFFEL UM AMYLOSETYPISCHE STÄRKE HERZUSTELLEN[1993/40]
English:GENETICALLY ENGINEERED MODIFICATION OF POTATO TO FORM AMYLOSE-TYPE STARCH[1993/40]
French:MODIFICATION DE LA POMME DE TERRE PAR MANIPULATION GENETIQUE PERMETTANT LA FORMATION DE FECULE DU TYPE AMYLOSE[1993/40]
Entry into regional phase17.07.1992Translation filed 
01.06.1993National basic fee paid 
01.06.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
01.06.1993Examination requested  [1993/40]
03.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/39]
29.10.2003Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/39]
Appeal following examination19.03.2002Appeal received No.  T0891/02
11.07.2002Statement of grounds filed
29.10.2003Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
29.10.2003Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:27.04.2000Request for further processing filed
27.04.2000Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.09.2000Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
03.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
06.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 10
05.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 11
05.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
30.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200313   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0368506  (ICI PLC [GB]);
 [A]EP0335451  (VERENIGING VOOR CHRISTELIJK WETENSCHAPPELIJK ONDERWIJS [NL]);
 [AP]  - BLENNOW A., JOHANSSON G., "ISOLATION OF A Q-ENZYME WITH M, 103000 FROM POTATO TUBERS.", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, GB, (19910101), vol. 30., no. 02., doi:10.1016/0031-9422(91)83700-U, ISSN 0031-9422, pages 437 - 444., XP000617730

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-9422(91)83700-U
 [A]  - VOS-SCHEPERKEUTER G. H., ET AL., "IMMUNOLOGICAL COMPARISON OF THE STARCH BRANCHING ENZYMES FROM POTATO TUBERS AND MAIZE KERNELS.", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY., AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD., US, US, (19890101), vol. 90., ISSN 0032-0889, pages 75 - 84., XP000617628
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.