blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0584073 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0584073



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
14.11.2000 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
02.12.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.09.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
25.09.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
02.08.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.08.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
02.08.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
16.07.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
06.07.1999 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
05.07.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.04.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
12.04.1999 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
30.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
30.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
22.02.1999 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
12.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
12.09.1998 Annex Search / examination 5
12.09.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
12.09.1998 Claims Search / examination 1
12.09.1998 Description Search / examination 2
12.09.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
16.07.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.07.1998 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
13.03.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.09.1997 Annex Search / examination 10
10.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
10.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
10.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
10.09.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
10.09.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
24.07.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.05.1997 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.02.1997 Annex Search / examination 5
03.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
03.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
03.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 1
03.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
03.02.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
04.10.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
25.05.1996 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
13.05.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
13.05.1996 Claims Search / examination 3
13.05.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
13.05.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
26.03.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.03.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
18.03.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.1995 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
03.05.1995 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
25.04.1994 Claims Search / examination 4
25.04.1994 Description Search / examination 4
25.04.1994 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.03.1994 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.02.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.01.1994 Partial European search report Search / examination 8
19.01.1994 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.01.1994 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.12.1993 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
19.11.1993 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
19.11.1993 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.11.1993 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
15.11.1993 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
02.11.1993 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
29.10.1993 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
19.01.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
26.11.1992 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
26.11.1992 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14