blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0584073


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.04.2005 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2005  [2005/23]
10.11.2000 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
26.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
05.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.07.1999 Surcharge for renewal fee
21.07.1999 Renewal fee
13.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant
13.07.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.07.1999 Surcharge for renewal fee
26.03.1999 Communication of intention to grant
26.03.1999 Change - designated states published on  12.05.1999 [1999/19]
26.03.1999 Change - German title published on  12.05.1999 [1999/19]
29.01.1999 Change - German title published on  17.03.1999 [1999/11]
22.01.1999 Change - German title published on  10.03.1999 [1999/10]
19.11.1998 Surcharge for renewal fee
19.11.1998 Renewal fee
17.09.1998 Examination report or reply
13.07.1998 Examination report or reply
07.07.1998 Surcharge for renewal fee
10.03.1998 Examination report or reply
17.09.1997 Examination report or reply
22.07.1997 Examination report or reply
07.06.1997 Renewal fee
07.02.1997 Examination report or reply
01.10.1996 Examination report or reply
08.06.1996 Renewal fee
16.05.1996 Examination report or reply
21.03.1996 Examination report or reply
30.11.1995 First examination report
24.02.1994 Supplementary search report published on  13.04.1994 [1994/15]
25.01.1994 Change - designated states published on  16.03.1994 [1994/11]
14.01.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  02.03.1994 [1994/09]
14.01.1994 Request for examination filed published on  02.03.1994 [1994/09]