Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0584073

EP0584073 - APPLICATION SYSTEM FOR TREATING WARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/09]APPLICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING WARTS
[1999/10]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DVORETZKY, Israel
39 Gateway
Hamden, CT 06514 / US
[1994/09]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/09]
Representative(s)Brown, Michael Stanley , et al
Alpha & Omega
Chine Croft
East Hill
Ottery St. Mary, Devon EX11 1PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/09]Brown, Michael Stanley , et al
Alpha and Omega Chine Croft East Hill
Ottery St. Mary Devon EX11 1PJ / GB
Application number, filing date92901984.217.05.1991
[1994/09]
WO1991US03477
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9220308
Date:26.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0584073
Date:02.03.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992
[1994/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0584073
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.11.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.02.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61F7/00
[1994/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1999/19]
Former [1994/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
Former [1994/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:APPLIKATIONSSYSTEM ZUM BEHANDELN VON WARZEN[1999/10]
English:APPLICATION SYSTEM FOR TREATING WARTS[1999/10]
French:SYSTEME D'APPLICATION POUR TRAITER DES VERRUES[1999/10]
Former [1994/09]APPLIKATIONSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON WARZEN
Former [1994/09]APPLICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATING WARTS
Former [1994/09]PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'APPLICATION POUR TRAITER DES VERRUES
Entry into regional phase13.12.1993National basic fee paid 
13.12.1993Search fee paid 
13.12.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
13.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/09]
05.12.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
24.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
09.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199808   M06   Fee paid on   09.11.1998
31.05.199909   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU17.05.2000
[2005/23]
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]US4756299  (PODELLA CARL W [US]);
 [Y]US4963360  (ARGAUD ALBERT [FR]);
 [Y]US4778786  (REEVER RICHARD [US], et al)