Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0510186

EP0510186 - THERAPEUTIC USES OF MELANIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.12.1999
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosource Technologies, Inc.
3333 Vaca Valley Parkway
Vacaville, CA 95688 / US
[1994/49]
Former [1992/44]For all designated states
BIOSOURCE GENETICS CORPORATION
3333 Vaca Valley Parkway
Vacaville, CA 95688 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BERLINER, David, L.
380 Selby Lane
Atherton, CA 94025 / US
02 / ERWIN, Robert, L.
336 Summerfield Drive
Vacaville, CA 95687 / US
03 / McGEE, David, R.
1990 Marshall Road
Vacaville, CA 95687 / US
[1992/44]
Representative(s)Schüssler, Andrea , et al
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler
Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1996/37]Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. , et al
Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246
81825 München / DE
Former [1996/05]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
D-81671 München / DE
Former [1992/44]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date92902038.605.11.1991
[1992/44]
WO1991US08213
Priority number, dateUS1990060931105.11.1990         Original published format: US 609311
[1992/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9207580
Date:14.05.1992
Language:EN
[1992/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0510186
Date:28.10.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992
[1992/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0510186
Date:03.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.02.1993
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/40, A61K47/46, A61K41/00
[1993/12]
Former International [1992/44]A61K37/48, A61K37/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1992/44]
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNGEN VON MELANIN[1992/44]
English:THERAPEUTIC USES OF MELANIN[1992/44]
French:UTILISATIONS THERAPEUTIQUES DE LA MELANINE[1992/44]
Entry into regional phase03.08.1992National basic fee paid 
03.08.1992Search fee paid 
03.08.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.08.1992Examination requested  [1992/44]
15.03.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
24.01.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.1997Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.04.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
29.07.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.1998Fee for grant paid
26.10.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.11.1999No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.02.1999
BE03.02.1999
GR03.02.1999
NL03.02.1999
SE03.02.1999
DK03.05.1999
[2003/45]
Former [2003/07]AT03.02.1999
BE03.02.1999
GR03.02.1999
NL03.02.1999
SE03.02.1999
Former [2002/23]AT03.02.1999
BE03.02.1999
GR03.02.1999
SE03.02.1999
Former [2001/23]AT03.02.1999
BE03.02.1999
GR03.02.1999
Former [2000/23]AT03.02.1999
BE03.02.1999
Former [2000/21]AT03.02.1999
DE04.05.1999
Former [2000/12]DE04.05.1999
Documents cited:Search[X]JP53124636  ;
 [E]WO9200373  ;
 [X]WO9002551  ;
 [A]EP0363792
 [X]  - BIOTECHNOLOGY vol. 8, no. 7, July 1990, pages 634 - 638 G. DELLA-CIOPPA ET AL. 'MELANIN PRODUCTION IN ESCHERICHIA COLI FROM A CLONED TYROSINASE GENE'
 [X]  - CANCER RESEARCH vol. 50, no. 1, January 1990, pages 138 - 141 J.A. CODERRE ET AL. 'SELECTIVE DELIVERY OF BORON BY THE MELANIN PRECURSOR ANALOGUE p-BORONOPHENYLALANINE TO TUMORS OTHER THAN MELANOMA'
 [X]  - THE JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOY vol. 92, no. 5, 1989, pages 321S - 325S Y. MISHIMA ET AL. 'TREATMENT OF MALIGNANT MELANOMA BY SELECTIVE THERMAL NEUTRON CAPTURE THERAPY USING MELANOMA-SEEKING COMPOUND'
 [X]  - Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 78-88551A(49) & JP-A-53 124 636 (MORI K.) 31 October 1978, & JP53124636 A 19781031
International search[X]  - The New England Journal of Medicine, Vol. 276, No. 7, 16 February 1967, G.C. COTZ et al., "Aromatice Amino Acids and Modification of Parkinsonism", pages 374-379, see the entire document.
 [A]  - Author unknown, Mechanism of Ageing and Development, Volume 21, published 1983 by Elsevier Scientific Publishers Ireland Ltd., see page 193-203.