Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0563230

EP0563230 - MINIATURE HARD DISK DRIVE FOR PORTABLE COMPUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mobile Storage Technology Inc.
5775 Flatiron Parkway Suite 100
Boulder, Colorado 80301-5730 / US
[1999/35]
Former [1993/40]For all designated states
INTEGRAL PERIPHERALS, INC.
5775 Flatiron Parkway, Suite 100
Boulder, CO 80301 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MOREHOUSE, James, H.
P.O. Box 264
Jamestown, CO 80455 / US
02 / FURAY, David, M.
1420 Bluebell Avenue
Boulder, CO 80302 / US
03 / VOLK, Steven, B.
3805 Norwood Court
Boulder, CO 80304 / US
04 / UTENICK, Michael, R.
6852 Peppertree Drive
Miwot CO 80503 / US
05 / DUNCKLEY, James, A.
2790 Stephens Road
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
06 / BLAGAILA, John, H.
1565 Ithach Drive
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
07 / HOPPER, James, F.
122 Jackson Circle
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
08 / KLEIN, Thomas, A.
1402 Meadowlark Drive
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
[1994/01]
Former [1993/40]01 / MOREHOUSE, James, H.
P.O. Box 264
Jamestown, CO 80455 / US
02 / FURAY, David, M.
288 Ridgeview Lane
Boulder, CO 80302 / US
03 / VOLK, Steven, B.
3805 Norwood Court
Boulder, CO 80304 / US
04 / UTENICK, Michael, R.
8309 E. Jamison Circle
Englewood, CO 80112 / US
05 / DUNCKLEY, James, A.
2790 Stephens Road
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
06 / BLAGAILA, John, H.
1565 Ithach Drive
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
07 / HOPPER, James, F.
122 Jackson Circle
Louisville, CO 80027 / US
08 / KLEIN, Thomas, A.
1402 Meadowlark Drive
Boulder, CO 80303 / US
Representative(s)Freeman, Jacqueline Carol , et al
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol , et al
W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [1993/40]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol , et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date92902358.818.12.1991
[1993/40]
WO1991US09181
Priority number, dateUS1990062994819.12.1990         Original published format: US 629948
[1993/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9211628
Date:09.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0563230
Date:06.10.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1992
[1993/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0563230
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 RE Reissue of patent specification 
No.:EP0563230
Date:06.12.2000
[2000/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.1994
ClassificationInternational:G11B5/012, G11B5/54, G11B21/22
[1994/30]
Former International [1993/40]G11B5/012, G11B5/54
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1993/40]
TitleGerman:MINIATUR-FESTPLATTENANTRIEB FÜR TRAGBAREN COMPUTER[1993/40]
English:MINIATURE HARD DISK DRIVE FOR PORTABLE COMPUTER[1993/40]
French:UNITE DE DISQUE DUR MINIATURE POUR ORDINATEUR PORTATIF[1993/40]
Entry into regional phase16.07.1993National basic fee paid 
16.07.1993Search fee paid 
16.07.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: LU
16.07.1993Examination requested  [1993/40]
19.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
09.01.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.1999Date of oral proceedings
22.02.1999Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
01.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1999Fee for grant paid
15.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
24.11.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0224378  (SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 2 * page 3, column 3, line 17 - page 4, column 5, line 8; figure - * [A] 1,3-12,14-20,25-37,50,52-60 [Y] 13,51;
 [Y]FR2588686  (SAGEM [FR]) [Y] 13 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 35; figure - *;
 [Y]US4965689  (NORMANN NORBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 51 * column 5, line 6 - column 10, line 45; figure - *;
 [A]EP0108500  (AMCODYNE INC [US]) [A] 1,2,13,25,33,51 * page 8, line 18 - page 14, line 18; figure - *
International search[X]US4553183
 [YP]US5027241
 [Y]US4772974
 [A]US4933785