Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0516838

EP0516838 - FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING HYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUTED AMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  07.12.2001
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 30.07.2008  [2008/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chevron Chemical Company LLC
2613 Camino Ramon
San Ramon, CA 94583-4289 / US
[2000/35]
Former [1996/43]For all designated states
CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY
P.O. Box 5047
San Ramon, CA 94583-0947 / US
Former [1996/12]For all designated states
CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY
P.O. Box 5047
San Ramon, CA 94583-0947 / US
Former [1995/16]For all designated states
CHEVRON U.S.A. Inc.
1635 Market Street
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Former [1992/50]For all designated states
CHEVRON RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY COMPANY
P.O. Box 7141, 525 Market Street
San Francisco, CA 94120-7141 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SABOURIN, Edward, T.
11 Avichi Knoll
Novato, CA 94947 / US
02 / BUCKLEY, Thomas, F.
133 Lapis Court
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
03 / CAMPBELL, Curtis, B.
118 Montego Drive
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
04 / TOMPKINS, Mary, J.
deceased / US
05 / Plavac, Frank
14 Park Terrace
MillValley, CA 94941 / US
[1996/27]
Former [1992/50]01 / SABOURIN, Edward, T.
11 Avichi Knoll
Novato, CA 94947 / US
02 / BUCKLEY, Thomas, F.
133 Lapis Court
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
03 / CAMPBELL, Curtis, B.
118 Montego Drive
Hercules, CA 94547 / US
04 / TOMPKINS, Mary, J.
deceased / US
Representative(s)Nash, David Allan , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/29]Nash, David Allan , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Former [1992/50]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
D-81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date92904183.823.12.1991
[1992/50]
WO1991US09703
Priority number, dateUS1990063464527.12.1990         Original published format: US 634645
[1992/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9212221
Date:23.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0516838
Date:09.12.1992
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992
[1992/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0516838
Date:03.07.1996
Language:EN
[1996/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.07.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.1993
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/22, C10L1/14, C10L10/00
[1996/27]
Former International [1992/50]C10L1/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1992/50]
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN WELCHE HYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUIERTE AMINE ENTHALTEN[1992/50]
English:FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING HYDROXYALKYL-SUBSTITUTED AMINES[1992/50]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE CARBURANT CONTENANT DES AMINES A SUBSTITUTION HYDROXYALKYLE[1992/50]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1992National basic fee paid 
25.08.1992Search fee paid 
25.08.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.1992Examination requested  [1992/50]
13.10.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.1994Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
21.04.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
04.01.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.01.1996Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.04.1996Fee for grant paid
02.04.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.04.1997  28.04.1997  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kinzebach, Werner
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
 02  03.04.1997  28.04.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Ferro Corporation
1000 Lakeside Avenue, Cleveland
Ohio 44114-1183 / US
Opponent's representative
Gille, Christian
Gille Hrabal
Patentanwälte
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/31]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.1997  28.04.1997  ADMISSIBLE
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
-Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kinzebach, Werner
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
 02  03.04.1997  28.04.1997  ADMISSIBLE
Ferro Corporation
1000 Lakeside Avenue, Cleveland
Ohio 44114-1183 / US
Opponent's representative
Gille, Christian
Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1997/22]
Opponent(s)01  03.04.1997   
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Kinzebach, Werner
Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49
81633 München / DE
 02  03.04.1997   
Ferro Corporation
1000 Lakeside Avenue, Cleveland
Ohio 44114-1183 / US
Opponent's representative
Gille, Christian
Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
12.05.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.1998Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.1998Date of oral proceedings
03.12.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
03.12.1998Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.10.2001Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/04]
06.12.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition29.01.1999Appeal received No.  T0116/99
13.04.1999Statement of grounds filed
18.10.2001Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
18.10.2001Date of oral proceedings
30.10.2001Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.07.1996
BE03.07.1996
CH03.07.1996
DK03.07.1996
GR03.07.1996
LI03.07.1996
SE03.10.1996
ES04.10.1996
LU31.12.1996
MC30.06.1998
[2004/38]
Former [2000/05]AT03.07.1996
BE03.07.1996
CH03.07.1996
DK03.07.1996
GR03.07.1996
LI03.07.1996
SE03.10.1996
LU31.12.1996
MC30.06.1998
Former [1998/45]AT03.07.1996
BE03.07.1996
CH03.07.1996
DK03.07.1996
LI03.07.1996
SE03.10.1996
MC30.06.1998
Former [1998/15]AT03.07.1996
BE03.07.1996
CH03.07.1996
DK03.07.1996
LI03.07.1996
SE03.10.1996
Former [1997/28]AT03.07.1996
BE03.07.1996
CH03.07.1996
LI03.07.1996
SE03.10.1996
Former [1997/24]AT03.07.1996
BE03.07.1996
SE03.10.1996
Former [1997/17]AT03.07.1996
SE03.10.1996
Former [1997/16]AT03.07.1996
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0476485
International search[X]US4123232  ;
 [Y]US4410335  ;
 [A]US4108613  ;
 [A]US4295860  ;
 [A]US4353711