EP0587567 - Front loading syringe driver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/12] | FRONT LOADING SYRINGE DRIVER | ||
[2002/13] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY 2111 E. Galbraith Road Cincinnati, OH 45237 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY 2111 E. Galbraith Road Cincinnati Ohio 45237 / US | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Liebel-Flarsheim Company 2111 E. Galbraith Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45237 / US | ||
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states LIEBEL-FLARSHEIM COMPANY 2111 East Galbraith Road Cincinnati, Ohio 45215-6305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEER, Charles 949 Tarragon Lane Milford, OH 45150 / US | 02 /
FAGO, Frank, M. 8581 High Trail Court Mason, OH 45040 / US | 03 /
DIETERLEN, Paul, E. Route 5 Colman Road Covington, KY 41015 / US | 04 /
GOETHEL, James, H. 9966 Thornwood Court Cincinnati, OH 45241 / US | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [1994/12] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92905378.3 | 16.01.1992 | [1994/12] | WO1992US00385 | Priority number, date | US19910712110 | 07.06.1991 Original published format: US 712110 | [1994/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9221391 | Date: | 10.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0587567 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0587567 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0587567 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/145 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
A61M5/14546 (EP,US);
A61M2250/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/14566 (EP,US);
A61M5/1458 (EP,US);
Y10S128/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Spritzenpumpe mit Frontladung | [2002/13] | English: | Front loading syringe driver | [2002/13] | French: | Système de poussée pour séringue à engagement frontal | [2002/13] |
Former [1994/12] | Spritzenpumpemit Frontladung | ||
Former [1994/12] | FRONT LOADING SYRINGE DRIVER | ||
Former [1994/12] | SYSTEME DE POUSSEE POUR SERINGUE A ENGAGEMENT FRONTAL | Miscellaneous | EPB 2002/13: (deleted) | EPB 2002/13: (deleted) | EPB 2002/13: (deleted) | EPB 1996/48: Teilanmeldung 96202623.3 eingereicht am 19/09/96 | EPB 1996/48: Divisional application 96202623.3 filed on 19/09/96 | EPB 1996/48: Demande divisionnaire 96202623.3 déposée le 19/09/96 | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.05.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04075345.1 / EP1421959 | EP96202623.3 / EP0749757 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.12.2002
13.01.2003
ADMISSIBLE Medrad Inc. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051-0780 / US Opponent's representative Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.12.2002
13.01.2003
ADMISSIBLE Medrad Inc. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051-0780 / US Opponent's representative Zinnecker, Armin Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.12.2002
Medrad Inc. One Medrad Drive Indianola, PA 15051-0780 / US Opponent's representative Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | 05.02.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.09.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.03.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.10.2009 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 20.12.2005 | Appeal received No. T1562/05 | 13.03.2006 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.06.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 26.06.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 22.05.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.1998 | Decision despatched | 16.06.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 16.06.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 02.07.1997 | Decision despatched | 18.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 18.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 01.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.2002 | BE | 27.03.2002 | CH | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | LI | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | LU | 16.01.2003 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4150672 (MARTIN JOHN K [US], et al); | [A]EP0143895 (DISETRONIC AG [CH]); | [A]US4695271 (GOETHEL JAMES H [US]); | [A]EP0346950 (MEDRAD INC [US]); | [A]EP0362484 (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) |