Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0573507

EP0573507 - REINFORCED ALLOY LAMINATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland
Whitehall
London SW1A 2HB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOV. OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Whitehall
London SW1A 2HB / GB
Former [1993/50]For all designated states
THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN
IRELAND; Whitehall
London SW1A 2HB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / MORETON, Roger
Tresayes, Albara Road, Church Crookham
Fleet, Hampshire GU13 0J2 / GB
02 / PEEL, Christopher John
26 Alton Road
Fleet, Hampshire GU13 9HN / GB
[1993/50]
Representative(s)Beckham, Robert William
Intellectual Property Department
DERA Farnborough
A4 Bldg
Ively Road
Farnborough, Hants GU14 0LX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/35]Beckham, Robert William
Intellectual Property Department DERA Farnborough A4 Bldg Ively Road
Farnborough, Hants GU14 0LX / GB
Former [1999/17]Beckham, Robert William
D/IPD DERA Formalities, A4 Building, Ively Road
Farnborough, Hants GU14 OLX / GB
Former [1993/50]Beckham, Robert William
Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough
Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB
Application number, filing date92905602.627.02.1992
[1993/50]
WO1992GB00351
Priority number, dateGB1991000441801.03.1991         Original published format: GB 9104418
[1993/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9215453
Date:17.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0573507
Date:15.12.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992
[1993/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0573507
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.09.1992
ClassificationInternational:B32B15/14, B64C1/00
[1993/50]
Designated contracting statesGB,   NL [1999/36]
Former [1993/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verstärkte Legierungsverbundstoffe[1993/50]
English:REINFORCED ALLOY LAMINATES[1993/50]
French:LAMINES EN ALLIAGE RENFORCE[1993/50]
Entry into regional phase04.08.1993National basic fee paid 
04.08.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
04.08.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
04.08.1993Examination requested  [1993/50]
29.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
27.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.1999Fee for grant paid
30.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
15.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[YP]EP0460809  ;
 [A]EP0322947  ;
 [A]EP0056288
 [XP]  - C. J. PEEL ET AL : "SOME DEVELOPMENTS IN THE PERFORMANCE OF LIGHTWEIGHT AEROSPACE STRUCTURAL MATERIALS" - 'ADVANCED MATERIALS: COST EFFECTIVENESS,QUALITY CONTROL, HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENT. A.KWAKERNAAK & L. VAN ARKEL (ED.S)' 29 May 1991 , SAMPE/ELSEVIER , AMSTERDAM
 [Y]  - BULL. MATER. SCI. vol. 13, no. 5, December 1990, BANGALORE pages 305 - 311; P. KANAKALATHA ET AL.: 'PREPARATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF ALUMINIUM ALLOY SHEET ARAMID FIBRE-LAMINATED COMPOSITES.'