Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0576546 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 555
20.04.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.01.2011 Closing of application Search / examination 2
07.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
07.01.2011 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.12.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 11
06.12.2010 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
01.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
01.12.2010 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
01.12.2010 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 3
11.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
11.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.11.2010 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Appeal 1
08.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
07.10.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
27.09.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 3
27.09.2010 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 6
22.09.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.07.2010 F3057 Communication: Change of responsibility of a Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.07.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
12.05.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
30.04.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
29.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
29.03.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.03.2010 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
29.03.2010 Annex Appeal 4
29.03.2010 Claims Appeal 3
29.03.2010 Claims Appeal 3
29.03.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.03.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2010 Request for re-establishment of rights Appeal 3
29.03.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
29.03.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
16.02.2010 Closing of application Search / examination 2
25.11.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.11.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
06.11.2009 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
06.11.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.11.2009 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
06.11.2009 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
06.11.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
06.11.2009 Means of redress Search / examination 2
06.11.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.11.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.11.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.11.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.10.2009 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.09.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.09.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
15.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.09.2009 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.09.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 5
28.04.2009 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
21.04.2009 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
15.04.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.04.2009 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.04.2009 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.03.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.03.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.03.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.11.2006 Description Search / examination 1
06.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.11.2006 Description Search / examination 1
01.11.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.08.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.08.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.08.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.04.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
24.04.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.06.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
24.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
21.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
14.02.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.08.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
09.08.1999 Description Search / examination 3
09.08.1999 Drawings Search / examination 8
09.08.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.08.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 20
30.03.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.10.1997 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
13.02.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
19.12.1994 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.12.1994 Annex to a communication Search / examination 8
14.12.1994 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
14.12.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.1994 European search report Search / examination 16
13.10.1994 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
08.10.1994 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
08.09.1994 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.09.1994 European search report Search / examination 4
06.04.1994 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.01.1994 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
17.01.1994 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
17.01.1994 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 1
24.11.1993 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.11.1993 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.11.1993 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 2
02.11.1993 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.10.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.1993 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.1993 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
27.09.1993 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
11.12.1992 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
13.11.1992 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
01.10.1992 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
01.10.1992 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 150
01.10.1992 Priority document Search / examination 134
08.05.1992 Notification of designations Search / examination 1