Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0533900

EP0533900 - LOW DELAY OR LOW LOSS CELL SWITCH FOR ATM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.06.1998
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1993/13]For all designated states
Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / SCHOUTE, Frederik, Carel
Orionlaan 94
NL-1223 AJ Hilversum / NL
02 / AWATER, Geert, Arnout
Oostsingel 17
NL-2612 HB Delft / NL
[1993/13]
Representative(s)Bakker, Hendrik , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [1993/13]Bakker, Hendrik , et al
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date92909960.409.04.1992
[1993/13]
WO1992NL00067
Priority number, dateEP1991020083510.04.1991         Original published format: EP 91200835
[1993/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9219060
Date:29.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0533900
Date:31.03.1993
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.1992
[1993/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0533900
Date:06.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.10.1992
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[1993/13]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1993/13]
TitleGerman:ATM-ZELLENVERTEILER MIT GERINGER VERZÖGERUNG ODER GERINGER VERLUSTRATE[1997/32]
English:LOW DELAY OR LOW LOSS CELL SWITCH FOR ATM[1993/13]
French:COMMUTATEUR DE CELLULES A FAIBLE RETARD OU A FAIBLES PERTES EN MODE DE TRANSFERT ASYNCHRONE[1997/32]
Former [1993/13]ZELLENVERMITTLUNG MIT GERINGER ANZÖGERUNG ODER GERINGER VERLUSTRATE
Former [1993/13]COMMUTATEUR DE CELLULES A FAIBLE RETARD ET A FAIBLES PERTES EN MODE DE TRANSFERT ASYNCHRONE
Entry into regional phase26.11.1992National basic fee paid 
26.11.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1992Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.11.1992Examination requested  [1993/13]
10.05.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
15.05.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.08.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.1996Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.02.1997Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.1997Fee for grant paid
21.05.1997Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.05.1998No opposition filed within time limit [1998/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE06.08.1997
CH06.08.1997
IT06.08.1997
LI06.08.1997
SE06.11.1997
[2008/02]
Former [1999/42]BE06.08.1997
CH06.08.1997
IT06.08.1997
LI06.08.1997
SE06.11.1997
Former [1998/43]BE06.08.1997
CH06.08.1997
LI06.08.1997
SE06.11.1997
Former [1998/21]BE06.08.1997
SE06.11.1997
Former [1998/15]SE06.11.1997
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0407161  ;
 [A]EP0362723
 [Y]  - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE vol. 79, no. 2, February 1991, NEW YORK, US pages 170 - 189; J. BAE ET AL: 'SURVEY OF TRAFFIC CONTROL SCHEMES AND PROTOCOLS IN ATM NETWORKS'
 [X]  - INT. SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM 90 vol. 5, May 1990, STOCKHOLM, SE pages 21 - 26; T. KOINUMA ET AL: 'AN ATM SWITCHING SYSTEM BASED ON A DISTRIBUTED CONTROL ARCHITECTURE'
 [A]  - IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS vol. 6, no. 9, December 1988, NEW YORK, US pages 1609 - 1616; H. OHNISHI ET AL: 'FLOW CONTROL SCHEMES AND DELAY/LOSS TRADEOFF IN ATM NETWORKS'