Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0578749

EP0578749 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FAST I/O TRANSFER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ECHELON CORPORATION
4015 Miranda Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[1994/03]
Inventor(s)01 / SINKS, Rod, G.
10316 Denison Avenue
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
02 / DONNER, Robert, W.
2580 Bean Creek Road
Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US
[1994/03]
Representative(s)Wombwell, Francis
Forresters
15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead
Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/03]Wombwell, Francis
Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square
Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB
Application number, filing date92910254.920.03.1992
[1994/03]
WO1992US02292
Priority number, dateUS1991067544826.03.1991         Original published format: US 675448
[1994/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9217846
Date:15.10.1992
Language:EN
[1992/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0578749
Date:19.01.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.1992
[1994/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0578749
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.10.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1993
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/32, G06F13/28, G06F13/12
[1994/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1994/03]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR SCHNELLE E/A-ÜBERTRAGUNG[1994/03]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FAST I/O TRANSFER[1994/03]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT E/S RAPIDE[1994/03]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1993National basic fee paid 
09.10.1993Search fee paid 
09.10.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.10.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
09.10.1993Examination requested  [1994/03]
28.10.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1999Fee for grant paid
23.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
20.03.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
04.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
IT05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
LU20.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
[2008/02]
Former [2004/39]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
LU20.03.2000
DK05.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2004/07]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
GR05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/45]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
DK05.04.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/18]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2003/17]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
MC31.03.2000
Former [2002/25]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
ES05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/24]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
MC30.09.2000
Former [2001/08]AT05.01.2000
BE05.01.2000
CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/52]CH05.01.2000
LI05.01.2000
Former [2000/50]CH10.04.2000
LI10.04.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS6473445  (HUDSON SOFT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-8;
 []US5034886  (YAMAMURA KIMIO [JP]) [ ] * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 63; figure 2 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 17 *;
 [X]EP0169577  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 11; figures 1,5,6B * * page 10, line 13 - page 14, line 35 *;
 [A]US4845662  (TOKUMITSU SHIGENORI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 13; figures 2,10 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 7 *;
 [A]EP0013853  (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 18 - page 8, line 23; figure 3 *
International search[X]US4837677
 [A]US4204250
 [A]US4792891
 [A]US4792898