blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0587708

EP0587708 - DETERMINATION OF INDUCED CHANGE OF POLARIZATION STATE OF LIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pauel Bjerre, Alan
Boholmsvej 7
3250 Gilleleje / DK
[2001/39]
Former [1997/32]For all designated states
Göttsche, Allan
Boholmsvej 7
3250 Gilleleje / DK
Former [1994/12]For all designated states
Göttsche, Allan
Norre Herlevvej 3
DK-3540 Lynge / DK
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1994/12]
Representative(s)Hegner, Mogens, et al
Hofman-Bang Zacco A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [1994/12]Hegner, Mogens, et al
HOFMAN-BANG & BOUTARD A/S Adelgade 15
DK-1304 Copenhagen K / DK
Application number, filing date92912232.304.06.1992
[1994/12]
WO1992DK00177
Priority number, dateDK1991000108607.06.1991         Original published format: DK 108691
[1994/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9221949
Date:10.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0587708
Date:23.03.1994
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1994/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0587708
Date:26.09.2001
Language:EN
[2001/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.12.1992
ClassificationIPC:G01J4/00, G01N21/23
[1994/12]
CPC:
G01J4/04 (EP,US); G01D5/344 (EP,US); G01L1/241 (EP,US);
G01L9/0077 (EP,US); G01R33/032 (EP,US); G02B6/2713 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1994/12]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG DER INDUZIERTEN ÄNDERUNG DES POLARISATIONSZUSTANDS VON LICHT[1994/12]
English:DETERMINATION OF INDUCED CHANGE OF POLARIZATION STATE OF LIGHT[1994/12]
French:DETERMINATION D'UN CHANGEMENT INDUIT D'ETAT DE POLARISATION DE LA LUMIERE[1994/12]
Entry into regional phase16.12.1993National basic fee paid 
16.12.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
16.12.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.01.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
16.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/12]
03.05.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.04.1997Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.08.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
11.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
18.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2001Fee for grant paid
11.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination11.06.1997Appeal received No.  T0984/97
25.08.1997Statement of grounds filed
10.03.1999Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)27.06.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/38]
Request for further processing for:10.02.1997Request for further processing filed
10.02.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.02.1997Decision despatched
19.01.1996Request for further processing filed
19.01.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
06.02.1996Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
26.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
19.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
10.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
11.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.199807   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.1998
30.06.199908   M06   Fee paid on   14.12.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
FR26.09.2001
IT26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DK26.12.2001
SE26.12.2001
DE28.12.2001
GR28.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
LU04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
[2008/02]
Former [2006/14]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
FR26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DK26.12.2001
SE26.12.2001
DE28.12.2001
GR28.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
LU04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
Former [2004/51]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DK26.12.2001
SE26.12.2001
DE28.12.2001
GR28.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
LU04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
Former [2004/39]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DK26.12.2001
SE26.12.2001
DE28.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
LU04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
Former [2004/16]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DK26.12.2001
SE26.12.2001
DE28.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
Former [2004/04]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DK26.12.2001
DE28.12.2001
ES26.03.2002
GB04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
Former [2003/45]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DK26.12.2001
DE28.12.2001
GB04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
Former [2003/25]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DE28.12.2001
GB04.06.2002
MC04.06.2002
Former [2003/17]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
DE28.12.2001
GB04.06.2002
Former [2003/09]AT26.09.2001
BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
Former [2003/07]BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
NL26.09.2001
Former [2003/01]BE26.09.2001
CH26.09.2001
LI26.09.2001
Former [2002/29]BE26.09.2001
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3980949  (FELDTKELLER ERNST);
 [XAY]GB2159944  (PHILIPS NV);
 [Y]US4841234  (AOSHIMA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US4948255  (WATANABE MASANORI [JP])
ExaminationDE2017863
 US4428017
 US4998063
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.