Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0583410

EP0583410 - CARDIAC VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.05.2002
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 22.08.2012  [2012/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3F Therapeutics, Inc
20412 James Bay Circle
Lake Forest, CA 92630 / US
[2002/02]
Former [1994/08]For all designated states
MURES CARDIOVASCULAR RESEARCH, INC.
1669 Glenview Court
Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEAC, Radu
Yale & Harvard Avenue, 505
Swarthmore, PA 19108 / US
[1994/08]
Representative(s)Fry, Alan Valentine , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/08]Fry, Alan Valentine , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date92913301.515.05.1992
[1994/08]
WO1992US04137
Priority number, dateUS1991070109916.05.1991         Original published format: US 701099
[1994/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9220303
Date:26.11.1992
Language:EN
[1992/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0583410
Date:23.02.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1992
[1994/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0583410
Date:25.07.2001
Language:EN
[2001/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US26.11.1992
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.1994
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[1994/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1994/08]
TitleGerman:HERZKLAPPE[1994/08]
English:CARDIAC VALVE[1994/08]
French:VALVULE CARDIAQUE[1994/08]
Entry into regional phase15.12.1993National basic fee paid 
15.12.1993Search fee paid 
15.12.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.12.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE
15.12.1993Examination requested  [1994/08]
17.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.01.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.04.2001Fee for grant paid
11.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
26.04.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
22.04.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
23.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
23.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200009   M06   Fee paid on   21.07.2000
Former [2002/18]DE26.10.2001
FR21.12.2001
Former [2002/15]DE26.10.2001
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US4790844  (OVIL YOEL [CA]);
 [Y]US4960424  (GROOTERS RONALD K [US])
 [X]  - Journal of Thoracic and Cardiovascular Surgery, June 1968, HOLDEFER et al., "Experimental Approach to Mitral Valve Replacement with Autologous Pericardium", paragraph 820-831, see entire document.
by applicantUS4790844