Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0587790

EP0587790 - NON-CHLOROFLUOROCARBON AEROSOL FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  21.01.2000
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): MC
published on 09.01.2008  [2008/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schering Corporation
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US
[N/P]
Former [1994/12]For all designated states
SCHERING CORPORATION
2000 Galloping Hill Road
Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FASSBERG, Julianne
175 W. 12th Street
New York, NY 10011 / US
02 / SEQUEIRA, Joel, A.
18 Stuyvesant Oval
New York, NY 10009 / US
03 / CHAUDRY, Imtiaz, A.
18 Rose Avenue
North Caldwell, NJ 07006 / US
04 / KOPCHA, Michael
141 Wycoff Way West
East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US
[1994/12]
Representative(s)Ritter, Stephen David
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/12]Ritter, Stephen David
Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date92913922.808.06.1992
[1994/12]
WO1992US04618
Priority number, dateUS1991071278910.06.1991         Original published format: US 712789
[1994/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9222287
Date:23.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0587790
Date:23.03.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992
[1994/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0587790
Date:03.01.1996
Language:EN
[1996/01]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0587790
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1992
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/72, C09K3/30
[1994/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1994/21]
Former [1994/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:FLUORCHLORKOHLENWASSERSTOFFREIE AEROSOLFORMULIERUNGEN[1994/12]
English:NON-CHLOROFLUOROCARBON AEROSOL FORMULATIONS[1994/12]
French:COMPOSITIONS AEROSOL SANS CHLOROFLUOROCARBONES[1994/12]
MiscellaneousEPB 1994/34: Verbunden mit 92305253.4/0518601 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 15.06.94
EPB 1994/34: Consolidated with 92305253.4/0518601 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 15.06.94
EPB 1994/34: Jointe à la demande no. 92305253.4/0518601 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 15.06.94
Entry into regional phase28.11.1993National basic fee paid 
23.06.1992Designation fee(s) paid 
28.11.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.1992Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.11.1993Examination requested  [1994/12]
19.07.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
29.06.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
07.07.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.1995Fee for grant paid
15.09.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP00103955.1  / EP1005860
EP02022987.8  / EP1277467
EP06016402.7  / EP1736147
EP95101761.5  / EP0656205
EP95101762.3  / EP0653205
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.1996   
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN England / GB
Opponent's representative
Watkins, Arnold Jack
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
 02  02.10.1996  14.10.1996  ADMISSIBLE
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Limited
RPR House 52 St Leonards Road
Eastbourne, East Sussex BN21 3YG / GB
Opponent's representative
Caffin, Lee
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Limited, Rainham Road South Dagenham
Essex RM10 7XS / GB
 03  04.10.1996  17.10.1996  ADMISSIBLE
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1, rue Carke Hébert
F-92145 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Opponent's representative
Merkle, Gebhard
Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1996/48]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.1996   
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN England / GB
Opponent's representative
Watkins, Arnold Jack
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
 02  02.10.1996   
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Limited
RPR House 52 St Leonards Road
Eastbourne, East Sussex BN21 3YG / GB
Opponent's representative
Caffin, Lee
Rhône-Poulenc Rorer Limited, Rainham Road South Dagenham
Essex RM10 7XS / GB
 03  04.10.1996   
ADIR ET COMPAGNIE
1, rue Carke Hébert
F-92145 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Opponent's representative
Merkle, Gebhard
TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45
81679 München / DE
14.11.1996Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.07.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.09.1997Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.1998Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.05.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.05.1999Date of oral proceedings
28.06.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.06.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.10.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.12.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
15.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
ES03.01.1996
FR03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
NL03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC30.06.1996
[2006/45]
Former [2006/40]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
ES03.01.1996
FR03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
NL03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC17.01.1997
Former [2006/14]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
ES03.01.1996
FR03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
NL03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC31.12.1997
Former [2003/18]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
ES03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
NL03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC31.12.1997
Former [2003/17]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
ES03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
NL03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC17.01.1997
Former [2003/07]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
ES03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
NL03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC31.12.1997
Former [2002/25]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
ES03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC31.12.1997
Former [2000/05]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
GR03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
LU30.06.1996
MC31.12.1997
Former [1999/42]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
IT03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
MC31.12.1997
Former [1998/24]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
MC31.12.1997
Former [1998/15]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
DK03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
MC31.12.1996
Former [1998/14]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
PT03.04.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
MC31.12.1996
Former [1997/22]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
MC31.12.1996
Former [1997/13]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
CH03.01.1996
LI03.01.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
Former [1996/51]AT03.01.1996
BE03.01.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
Former [1996/44]AT03.01.1996
SE03.04.1996
DE04.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
Former [1996/42]AT03.01.1996
SE03.04.1996
FR31.05.1996
Former [1996/38]SE03.04.1996
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0372777  ;
 [X]WO9104011  (RIKER LABORATORIES INC [US]);
 [X]WO9011754  (FISONS PLC [GB]);
 [X]WO9007333  (RIKER LABORATORIES INC [US]);
 [XP]WO9208446  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB]);
 [XP]WO9200107  (GLAXO INC [US]);
 [XP]WO9200062  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]);
 [XP]WO9200061  (FISONS PLC [GB]);
 [XP]WO9114422  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]);
 [XP]WO9111495  (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al);
 [XP]WO9111173  (FISONS PLC [GB])