blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0590058 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0590058



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 701
20.03.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
08.07.2010 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
29.09.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.10.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
09.10.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
17.09.2003 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
12.09.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
12.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
12.09.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
10.06.2003 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
15.04.2003 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
07.04.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
07.04.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.01.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.09.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.09.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.08.2002 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.04.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.04.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
23.04.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 105
07.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
07.12.2001 Description Search / examination 2
07.12.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.10.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.05.2001 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
28.05.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
18.05.2001 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
18.05.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
30.04.2001 Description Search / examination 27
30.04.2001 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
10.03.2001 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.03.2001 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
09.03.2001 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.03.2001 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
05.03.2001 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
03.03.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.03.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
01.03.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
01.03.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
13.02.2001 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
13.02.2001 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
22.01.2001 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
22.01.2001 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 28
22.01.2001 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 1
22.01.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
20.01.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
19.01.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 32
19.01.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 32
18.01.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
18.01.2001 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
09.10.2000 Claims Search / examination 6
09.10.2000 Description Search / examination 9
09.10.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.10.2000 Request for accelerated examination Search / examination 1
19.09.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
28.07.2000 Claims Search / examination 7
28.07.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
26.07.2000 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
11.07.2000 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
05.06.2000 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.05.2000 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.01.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
16.10.1998 Claims Search / examination 7
16.10.1998 Description Search / examination 3
16.10.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.07.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
10.07.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.04.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
07.04.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.07.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
11.07.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.04.1997 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
07.04.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
07.04.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.04.1997 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
05.02.1997 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
31.10.1996 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.10.1996 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.06.1996 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
03.05.1995 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.04.1995 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
23.02.1994 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.11.1993 Claims Search / examination 4
26.11.1993 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
30.09.1993 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 3
30.09.1993 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 8
08.02.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.01.1993 Priority document Search / examination 118
23.12.1992 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
23.12.1992 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 132