blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0590058


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.10.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  17.11.2004  [2004/47]
10.10.2003 (Expected) grant published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
10.10.2003 Change - classification published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
10.10.2003 Change - applicant published on  26.11.2003  [2003/48]
26.09.2003 Change - divisional application(s) published on  12.11.2003  [2003/46]
23.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
23.09.2003 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
26.06.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.06.2003 Communication of intention to grant
05.06.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
23.05.2003 Change - German title published on  09.07.2003  [2003/28]
18.04.2003 Change - German title published on  04.06.2003  [2003/23]
12.04.2003 Examination report or reply
31.01.2003 Examination report or reply
25.09.2002 Examination report or reply
02.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant
21.06.2002 Renewal fee
19.04.2002 Communication of intention to grant
12.04.2002 Change - German title published on  29.05.2002  [2002/22]
01.02.2002 Change - German title published on  20.03.2002  [2002/12]
11.01.2002 Change - German title published on  27.02.2002  [2002/09]
13.12.2001 Examination report or reply
05.10.2001 Examination report or reply
21.06.2001 Renewal fee
23.05.2001 Examination report or reply
16.05.2001 Change - oral proceedings
05.03.2001 Change - oral proceedings
08.02.2001 Observations by third parties
12.10.2000 Examination report or reply
12.10.2000 Request for accelerated examination
14.09.2000 Examination report or reply
08.08.2000 Examination report or reply
21.06.2000 Renewal fee
30.05.2000 Examination report or reply
17.01.2000 Examination report or reply
23.06.1999 Renewal fee
26.03.1999 Change - divisional application(s) published on  12.05.1999 [1999/19]
22.10.1998 Examination report or reply
14.07.1998 Examination report or reply
24.06.1998 Renewal fee
02.04.1998 Examination report or reply
21.06.1997 Renewal fee
19.04.1997 Change - request for further processing
17.04.1997 Change - request for further processing
15.04.1997 Examination report or reply
15.04.1997 Change - request for further processing
01.02.1997 Application deemed to be withdrawn
29.10.1996 Examination report or reply
21.06.1996 Examination report or reply
21.06.1996 First examination report
18.06.1996 Renewal fee
26.04.1995 Change - representative published on  14.06.1995 [1995/24]
18.02.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.04.1994 [1994/14]
18.02.1994 Request for examination filed published on  06.04.1994 [1994/14]