blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0590058

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 MC 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure12.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase26.11.1993National basic fee paid 
26.11.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1993Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
European patent granted26.11.2003
Opposition procedure27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 17.11.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:06.04.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE
 
Event date:06.04.1994 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19931126
 
Event date:07.08.1996 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19960625
 
Event date:27.02.2002 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:HUMANIZED HEREGULIN ANTIBODY
 
Event date:20.03.2002 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:HUMANIZED HEREGULIN ANTIBODY
 
Event date:29.05.2002 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:HUMANIZED HEREGULIN ANTIBODY
 
Event date:04.06.2003 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:HUMANIZED HEREGULIN ANTIBODY
 
Event date:09.07.2003 
Event description:TITLE (CORRECTION)
Free Format Text:HUMANIZED HEREGULIN ANTIBODY
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:7C 07K 16/30 A
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:GENENTECH, INC.
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE
 
Event date:26.11.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:28.11.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:08.01.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69233254
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040108
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:16.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:19.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20040400516 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:24.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE V448 69233254 DE
Code Expl.:+APPLICATION OF SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB UND DESSEN VARIANTEN UND IMMUNCHEMISCHEN DERIVATE, EINSCHLIESSLICH IMMUNTOXINE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001, 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:12 2004 000 008
Filing DATE:20040324
 
Event date:29.03.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:06.04.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB, SES VARIANTS ET DERIVES IMMUNOCHIMIQUES INCLUANT LES IMMUNOTOXINES; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: LI - IKS 5506501 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04C0007
Filing DATE:20040406
 
Event date:04.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:0490008-0, 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:0490008-0
Filing DATE:20000828
 
Event date:04.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB OCH DESS VARIANTER OCH IMMUNOKEMISKA DERIVAT, INKLUSIVE; NAT REG. NO/DATE: EG EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REG.: EG EU/1/00/145/001 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04900080.L
 
Event date:15.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT UEP 255131 AT T
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
 
Event date:16.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2206447 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:19.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:SPC/GB04/015: 20040420
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB04/015
Filing DATE:20040420
 
Event date:21.05.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CR
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE LAID OPEN TO THE PUBLIC (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)
Free Format Text:04C0007, 20040406
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04C0007
Filing DATE:20040406
 
Event date:01.06.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL AC1
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:300145
Filing DATE:20040405
 
Event date:02.06.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU CCP
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:91067, EXPIRES: 20150828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:91067
Expiry DATE:20150828
 
Event date:09.07.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
 
Event date:15.08.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT ESZA
Code Expl.:+APPLICATION FILED FOR A CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION (E-SERIES)
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB, GEGEBENENFALLS IN FORM EINES KONJUGATS MIT EINER CYTOTOXISCHEN GRUPPE
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SZ 4/2004
Filing DATE:20040330
 
Event date:27.08.2004 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:17.11.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040827
 
Event date:15.12.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT EEZF
Code Expl.:+GRANT FOR A CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION (E-SERIES)
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SZ 4/2004
Filing DATE:20040330
Extension DATE:20150828
Effective DATE:20041104
 
Event date:20.12.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK CTFF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:CA 2004 00004
Filing DATE:20040401
Expiry DATE:20150828
 
Event date:23.12.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE 8364 69233254 DE
Code Expl.:+NO OPPOSITION DURING TERM OF OPPOSITION
 
Event date:01.06.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES SPCF 2206447 ES T3
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB (HERCEPTIN), REGISTRY NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828, FIRST REGISTRY NO/DATE: UEEU/1/00/145/001 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C200400010
Filing DATE:20040503
 
Event date:14.09.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFG
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
Free Format Text:SPC/GB04/015: 20050809, EXPIRES: 20140728
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB04/015
Filing DATE:20050809
Expiry DATE:20140728
 
Event date:21.10.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CL
Code Expl.: CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES
 
Event date:10.11.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CL
Code Expl.: CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04C0007
 
Event date:21.03.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCG
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04900080.L
 
Event date:16.09.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES SPCQ ES T3
Code Expl.: APPEAL AGAINST A DECISION RELATED TO A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE: ADMITTED
Free Format Text:TEXTO DE LA RESOLUCION: ANULANDO LA RESOLUCI0N RECURRIDA Y ACORDANDO LA MODIFICACION DE LA FECHA DE DURACION DEL CCP
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C200400010
Effective DATE:20070726
 
Event date:21.07.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK CTFG
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) ISSUED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:CA 2004 00004
Filing DATE:20040401
 
Event date:18.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CY
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION GRANTED (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB, SES VARIANTS ET DERIVES IMMUNOCHIMIQUES INCLUANT LES IMMUNOTOXINES; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: EU/1/00/145/001 DU 20000828; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: EU/1/00/145/001 DU 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04C0007
Filing DATE:20040406
Extension DATE:20150828
 
Event date:18.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AV
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
 
Event date:18.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AV
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2004C0007
 
Event date:28.04.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL KC1
Code Expl.: GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C300145
Filing DATE:20040405
Extension DATE:20150827
 
Event date:15.08.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT ESZX
Code Expl.: AMENDMENTS TO GRANTED SPC
Free Format Text:CORRECTION OF MAXIMAL DURATION OF THE EXTENSION OF THE PROTECTION
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SZ 4/2004
Extension DATE:20140729
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CY
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION GRANTED (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB, SES VARIANTS ET DERIVES IMMUNOCHIMIQUES INCLUANT LES IMMUNOTOXINES; REGISTRATION NO/DATE IN FRANCE: EU/1/00/145/001 DU 20000828; REGISTRATION NO/DATE AT EEC: IKS 5506501 DU 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04C0007
Filing DATE:20040406
Extension DATE:20140729
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AV
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
 
Event date:31.12.2010 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ER
Code Expl.: ERRATA LISTED IN THE FRENCH OFFICIAL JOURNAL (BOPI)
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04C0007
 
Event date:25.02.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AV
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:04C0007
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20110621
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20110601
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20110614
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20110613
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20110511
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20110530
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20110621
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20110615
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20110526
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20110610
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20110621
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20110614
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20110608
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20110617
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:11.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R067 DE
Code Expl.:+EXAMINING DIVISION DECISION GRANTING SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122004000008
Filing DATE:20040324
 
Event date:11.11.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R067 69233254 DE
Code Expl.:+EXAMINING DIVISION DECISION GRANTING SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: CH 55065 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122004000008
Filing DATE:20040324
Expiry DATE:20120616
Extension DATE:20140729
 
Event date:14.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69233254 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:VOSSIUS & PARTNER, 81675 MUENCHEN, DE
 
Event date:14.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R082 69233254 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE
Representatives Name:VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE
 
Event date:16.12.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CERR
Code Expl.: CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATION FOR SPCS
Free Format Text:CORRECTION DE BOPI 05/42 - CONCESSION DE LICENCE. IL Y A LIEU D AJOUTER : LE CCP NA 04C0007 A L INSCRIPTION NA 147090 DU 12/09/ 2005 CONCERNANT UNE CONCESSION DE LICENCE
 
Event date:16.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69233254 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:27.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V4
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20120615
 
Event date:27.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL KC1
Code Expl.: GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: 55065 01EU/1/00/145/001 1999280729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C300145
Filing DATE:20040405
Extension DATE:20140728
 
Event date:29.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:30.06.2012 
Event description:BE: PATENT EXPIRED
Owner Name:*GENENTECH INC.
Effective DATE:20120615
 
Event date:02.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
 
Event date:04.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20120614
 
Event date:11.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFE
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE ENTERED INTO FORCE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB AND IMMUNOLOGICAL DERIVATIVES THEREOF; REGISTERED: CH 55065 19990729; UK EU/1/00/145/001 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB04/015
Filing DATE:20040420
Expiry DATE:20120615
Extension DATE:20140728
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20120616
 
Event date:31.08.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20120614
 
Event date:03.09.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR MA 20040400516 GR
Code Expl.:-RIGHT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20120616
 
Event date:15.09.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT MK07 255131 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY
Effective DATE:20120615
 
Event date:16.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20121116
 
Event date:28.02.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20120616
 
Event date:01.08.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R069 69233254 DE
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: CH 55065 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122004000008
Filing DATE:20040324
Expiry DATE:20120616
Extension DATE:20140729
Effective DATE:20111206
 
Event date:30.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69233254 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: CH 55065 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122004000008
Filing DATE:20040324
Expiry DATE:20120616
Extension DATE:20140729
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG BE CCRE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Owner Name:*GENENTECH INC.
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ANTICORPS HUMANISE SPECIFIQUE POUR HEREGULIN; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: CH 55065 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2004C/006
Filing DATE:20040331
Expiry DATE:20120615
Extension DATE:20140729
Effective DATE:20140729
 
Event date:06.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SPCX
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; NATL. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: CH 55065 01 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C300145
Filing DATE:20040405
Expiry DATE:20120615
Extension DATE:20140728
 
Event date:15.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCL
Code Expl.:-SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DELETION
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C00590058/01
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB SPCE
Code Expl.:-SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE EXPIRED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB AND IMMUNOLOGICAL DERIVATIVES THEREOF; REGISTERED: CH 55065 19990729; UK EU/1/00/145/001 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB04/015
Filing DATE:20040420
Expiry DATE:20120615
Extension DATE:20140728
 
Event date:04.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69233254 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB; NAT. REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828; FIRST REGISTRATION: CH 55065 19990729
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122004000008
Filing DATE:20040324
Expiry DATE:20120616
Extension DATE:20140729
Effective DATE:20140730
 
Event date:15.09.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT SPCX 255131 AT T
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: TRASTUZUMAB, GEGEBENENFALLS IN FORM EINES KONJUGATS MIT EINER CYTOTOXISCHEN GRUPPE; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/00/145/001 20000828
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:4/2004
Filing DATE:20040330
Expiry DATE:20120615
Extension DATE:20140729
Effective DATE:20140729