Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0590058

EP0590058 - HUMANIZED Heregulin ANTIBODy [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1994/14]METHOD FOR MAKING HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES
[2002/09]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.10.2004
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.2004  [2004/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
[N/P]
Former [2003/48]For all designated states
Genentech, Inc.
1 DNA Way
South San Francisco, CA 94080-4990 / US
Former [1994/14]For all designated states
GENENTECH, INC.
460 Point San Bruno Boulevard
South San Francisco California 94080 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CARTER, Paul, J.
2074 18th Avenue
San Francisco, CA 94116 / US
02 / PRESTA, Leonard, G.
1900 Gough Street, 206
San Francisco, CA 94109 / US
[1994/14]
Representative(s)Barz, Peter
Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR
Postfach 86 06 24
81633 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/24]Barz, Peter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2
D-80803 München / DE
Former [1994/14]Barz, Peter, Dr.
Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Siegfriedstrasse 8
D-80803 München / DE
Application number, filing date92914220.615.06.1992
[1994/14]
WO1992US05126
Priority number, dateUS1991071527214.06.1991         Original published format: US 715272
[1994/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9222653
Date:23.12.1992
Language:EN
[1992/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0590058
Date:06.04.1994
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992
[1994/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0590058
Date:26.11.2003
Language:EN
[2003/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.12.1992
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/30
[2003/48]
Former International [1994/14]C12N15/13, C12P21/08, C07K13/00, C12N5/10, G06F15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   SE [1994/14]
TitleGerman:Humanisierter Heregulin Antikörper[2002/09]
English:HUMANIZED Heregulin ANTIBODy[2002/09]
French:ANTICORP HUMANISE specifique pour heregulin[2002/09]
Former [1994/14]Verfahren zur Herstellung von humanisierten Antikörpern
Former [1994/14]METHOD FOR MAKING HUMANIZED ANTIBODIES
Former [1994/14]PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ANTICORPS HUMANISES
Entry into regional phase26.11.1993National basic fee paid 
26.11.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
26.11.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
07.01.1993Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.11.1993Examination requested  [1994/14]
25.06.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.02.1997Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
07.04.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.10.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
18.01.2001Observations by third parties
28.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
27.08.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
27.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2003Fee for grant paid
12.09.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03020814.4  / EP1400536
EP99105252.3  / EP0940468
Opposition(s)27.08.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/47]
Request for further processing for:07.04.1997Request for further processing filed
07.04.1997Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.04.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
10.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
15.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
13.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 09
13.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 10
12.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
12.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9007861  (PROTEIN DESIGN LABS INC [US]);
 [Y]  TRAMONTANO A. ET AL., "Framework residue 71 is a major determinant of the position and conformation of the second hypervariable region in the VH domains of immunoglobulins", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESSS, (1990), vol. 215, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-2836(05)80102-0, pages 175 - 182, XP002906214

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(05)80102-0
 [Y]  CHOTHIA C. ET AL., "Conformations of immunoglobulin hypervariable region cited in the application", NATURE, LONDON GB, (198912), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883,
 [XP]  CARTER P. ET AL., "Humanization of an anti-p185HER2 antibody for human cancer therapy", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEYM OF SCIENCES OF USA. WASHINGTON US, (199205), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.89.10.4285, pages 4285 - 4289, XP000275844

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.10.4285
Examination   - Foote, J., Nova acta Leopoldina NF 61 (269): 103-110 (1998),
    - Riechmann, L. et al., Nature 332: 323-327 (1988),
otherEP0328404
    - RIECHMANN L. ET AL., "Reshaping Human Antibodies for Therapy", NATURE, (19880324), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327,
    - QUEEN C. ET AL, NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 10029 - 10033,