EP0590072 - USE OF SPIN TRAPPING FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH OXIDATION OF LIPIDS AND PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oklahoma Medical Research Foundation 825 N.E. 13th Street Oklahoma City, OK 73104 / US | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY RESEARCH FOUNDATION Administration Building, Room 11 Lexington, KY 40506-0032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states Oklahoma Medical Research Foundation 825 N.E. 13th Street Oklahoma City Oklahoma 73104 / US | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF KENTUCKY RESEARCH FOUNDATION Administration Building, Room 11 Lexington, KY 40506-0032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARNEY, John, M. 4033 Palomor Lexington, KY 40503 / US | 02 /
FLOYD, Robert, A. 12621 Arrowhead Terrace Oklahoma City, OK 73120 / US | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Burford, Anthony Frederick, et al W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92914539.9 | 18.06.1992 | [1994/14] | WO1992US05194 | Priority number, date | US19910716952 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: US 716952 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9222290 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0590072 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0590072 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/40, A61K31/44, A61K31/445 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/445 (EP);
A61K31/135 (EP);
A61K31/15 (EP);
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/14] | Title | German: | RADIKALFÄNGER ("SPIN TRAPS") ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MIT OXIDATION VON LIPIDEN UND PROTEINEN VERBUNDENEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [1994/14] | English: | USE OF SPIN TRAPPING FOR THE TREATMENT OF DISEASES ASSOCIATED WITH OXIDATION OF LIPIDS AND PROTEINS | [1994/14] | French: | EMPLOI DU BLOCAGE PAR SPIN POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES ASSOCIEES A L'OXYDATION DES LIPIDES ET DES PROTEINES | [1994/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1994 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 11.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.12.2001 | BE | 05.12.2001 | GR | 05.12.2001 | NL | 05.12.2001 | DK | 05.03.2002 | LU | 18.06.2002 | MC | 18.06.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/04] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
MC | 18.06.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
DK | 05.03.2002 | ||
MC | 18.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
MC | 18.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 05.12.2001 | |
BE | 05.12.2001 | ||
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 05.12.2001 | |
GR | 05.12.2001 | ||
NL | 05.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 05.12.2001 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8805044 (PHARMACIA AB [SE]); | [X]WO8805653 (PROCTOR PETER H [US]); | [X]WO9105552 (OKLAHOMA MED RES FOUND [US], et al) | [X] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences of the USA, vol. 88, no. 11, 1 June 1991, D. GELVAN et al.: "Cardiac reperfusion damage prevented by a nitroxide free radical", pages 4680-4684, see whole document | [X] - Journal of Cardiovascular Pharmacology, vol. 9, no. 6, June 1987, Raven Press, (New York, US), D.J. HEARSE et al.: "Reperfusion-induced arrhythmias and free radicals: studies in the rat heart with DMPO", pages 641-650, see whole document | [X] - Biochimica et Biophysica Acta, vol. 1096, no. 3, 1991, ELsevier Science Publishers B.V., (Amsterdam, NL), R.A. TOWNER et al.: "Enhancement of carbon tetrachloride-induced liver injury by a single dose of ethanol: proton magnetic resonance imaging (MRI) studies in vivo", pages 222-230, see whole document | [X] - Journal of Molecular Neuroscience, vol. 3, no. 1, 1991, Birkhäuser, (Boston, US), J.M. CARNEY et al.: "Protection against oxidative damage to CNS by alpha-phenyl-tert-butyl nitrone (PBN) and other spin-trapping agents: a novel series of nonlipid free radical scavengers", pages 47-57, see whole document | [A] - The Journal of Physical Chemistry, vol. 84, no. 5, 6 March 1980, American Chemical Society, E.E. BANCROFT et al.: "Spin trapping with covalently immobilized alpha-phenyl-N-((1-hydroxy-2-methyl)-2-propyl) nitrone", pages 557-558, see whole document | [X] - Neuroscience Letters, vol. 116, no. 3, 1990, Elsevier Scientific Publishers Ireland Ltd, J.W. PHILLIS et al.: "Protection from cerebral ischemic injury in gerbils with the spin trap agent N-tert-butyl-alpha-phenylnitrone (PBN)", pages 315-319, see whole document | [A] - Izv. Sib. Oto. Akad. Nauk (SSSR), Ser. Klin. Nauk., no. 1, 1989, G.G. DUL'TSEVA et al.: "New spin traps III. 2,3-Dihydropyrazine-1,4-dioxides-cyclic conjugated alpha-dinitrones and alpha-phenylnitrones with functional groups", pages 77-81, see abstract, page 81 and schema 2, page 79 | Examination | US3834073 | US4153722 | WO9113618 |