blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0597881 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0597881



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 459
30.01.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
30.01.2003 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
24.01.2003 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
13.01.2003 Claims Opposition 4
13.01.2003 Claims Opposition 5
13.01.2003 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.10.2002 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
11.10.2002 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
11.10.2002 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
17.09.2002 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
10.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.06.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
10.06.2002 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.06.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 5
06.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
06.06.2002 Text intended for grant Opposition 14
22.04.2002 Claims Opposition 1
22.04.2002 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.12.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 2
12.12.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
04.12.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
12.11.2001 Claims Opposition 3
12.11.2001 Description Opposition 3
12.11.2001 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
05.10.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
07.05.2001 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
07.05.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 3
26.04.2001 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 1
21.03.2001 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 2
16.03.2001 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.11.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
31.10.2000 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
27.10.2000 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 2
16.10.2000 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.10.2000 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.10.2000 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
05.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
05.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
04.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 13
04.10.2000 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
06.12.1999 Communication regarding a request to amend/correct the documents for grant Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
25.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
25.11.1999 Claims Search / examination 2
25.11.1999 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.11.1999 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
15.11.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
15.11.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 6
14.10.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
06.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.08.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
25.08.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 21
14.07.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
28.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
28.05.1999 Description Search / examination 3
28.05.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
28.05.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
28.05.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.04.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.04.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.02.1999 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 8
28.01.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
28.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
28.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
04.01.1999 Annex Search / examination 8
04.01.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
04.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
04.01.1999 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
04.01.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
21.08.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.08.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
20.07.1998 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
20.07.1998 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
10.07.1998 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.04.1998 Claims Search / examination 5
06.04.1998 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
06.04.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.04.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
02.02.1998 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
02.02.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.02.1998 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
26.01.1998 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
23.01.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.09.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.08.1997 Claims Search / examination 6
19.08.1997 Description Search / examination 1
19.08.1997 Drawings Search / examination 1
19.08.1997 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
27.06.1997 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.06.1997 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
17.02.1997 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
25.07.1995 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
03.07.1995 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
22.06.1995 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.06.1995 European search report Search / examination 6
02.07.1994 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.04.1994 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.03.1994 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
23.03.1994 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
23.03.1994 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
15.03.1994 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.1994 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
14.12.1993 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.1993 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
14.12.1993 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 6
14.12.1993 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
14.12.1993 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
29.10.1993 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
29.10.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
17.09.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.08.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
22.03.1993 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
08.02.1993 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.12.1992 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.12.1992 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 30
23.12.1992 Priority document Search / examination 28
23.07.1992 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
12.06.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
12.06.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
12.06.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2