blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0597881


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.01.2003 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  12.03.2003  [2003/11]
20.12.2002 Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973)
09.10.2002 Communication/fee (R.58(5) EPC1973)
20.09.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
03.06.2002 Interlocutory decision in opposition
25.04.2002 Communication of examination report in opposition
07.12.2001 Communication of examination report in opposition
14.11.2001 Communication of examination report in opposition
02.10.2001 Communication of examination report in opposition
02.05.2001 Communication of examination report in opposition
23.03.2001 Observations of proprietor on opposition
03.11.2000 Observations of proprietor on opposition
13.10.2000 Opposition filed published on  29.11.2000 [2000/48]
12.10.2000 Unpublished change to opponent data
19.11.1999 (Expected) grant published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
25.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant
11.10.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.09.1999 Change - divisional application(s) published on  03.11.1999 [1999/44]
20.08.1999 Communication of intention to grant
18.06.1999 Renewal fee
03.06.1999 Examination report or reply
15.04.1999 Examination report or reply
03.02.1999 Examination report or reply
12.01.1999 Examination report or reply
18.08.1998 Examination report or reply
15.07.1998 Observations by third parties
17.06.1998 Renewal fee
14.04.1998 Examination report or reply
28.01.1998 Examination report or reply
28.01.1998 Observations by third parties
20.09.1997 Examination report or reply
22.08.1997 Examination report or reply
25.06.1997 Examination report or reply
18.06.1997 Renewal fee
14.02.1997 First examination report
13.02.1997 Examination report or reply
15.06.1996 Renewal fee
22.06.1995 Change - applicant published on  09.08.1995 [1995/32]
19.06.1995 Supplementary search report published on  09.08.1995 [1995/32]
01.06.1995 Change - classification published on  19.07.1995 [1995/29]
08.04.1994 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.05.1994 [1994/21]
08.04.1994 Request for examination filed published on  25.05.1994 [1994/21]