blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0597881

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
Entry into regional phase08.01.1994National basic fee paid 
08.01.1994Search fee paid 
08.01.1994Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.1994Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.05.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
09.06.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
07.06.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
05.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
04.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted05.01.2000
Opposition procedure13.12.2002Fee for printing new specification paid 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.05.1994 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:25.05.1994 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19940108
 
Event date:19.07.1995 
Event description:MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/028
 
Event date:09.08.1995 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
 
Event date:09.08.1995 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:02.04.1997 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19970217
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:188362
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000115
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:14.01.2000 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
Owner Name:MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.
 
Event date:14.01.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:14.01.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE
 
Event date:10.02.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69230534
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20000210
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:17.04.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:05.05.2000 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:01.06.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2143988 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:29.11.2000 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES LLC
Effective DATE:20001004
 
Event date:01.02.2001 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES LLC
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:12.03.2003 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20030312
 
Event date:12.03.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:27.03.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AEN
Code Expl.: MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT
Free Format Text:AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM
 
Event date:14.04.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EBP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:01.05.2003 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20030312
 
Event date:02.06.2003 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY
Effective DATE:20030602
 
Event date:17.06.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20030401866 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
 
Event date:01.07.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE RPEO
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN AMENDED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO
 
Event date:01.08.2003 
Event description:NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE
 
Event date:16.11.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES DC2A 20030606 T5
Code Expl.: PATENT MODIFIED
 
Event date:12.12.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION
 
Event date:25.03.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20040325
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:27.04.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20040427
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:06.05.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20040506
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:03.06.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20040603
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:08.06.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20040608
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:12.06.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050612
 
Event date:12.06.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050612
 
Event date:13.06.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050613
 
Event date:30.06.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050630
 
Event date:30.06.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20050630
 
Event date:15.02.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:21.02.2006 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:29.07.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20110621
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20110608
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20110610
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20110621
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20110620
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20110614
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.09.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20110608
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:30.11.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20110715
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:12.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69230534 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:13.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69230534 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT
 
Event date:20.06.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL V4
Code Expl.:-LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT
Effective DATE:20120612
 
Event date:30.06.2012 
Event description:BE: PATENT EXPIRED
Owner Name:*ABBOTT LABORATORIES
Effective DATE:20120612
 
Event date:04.07.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB PE20
Code Expl.:-PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS
Expiry DATE:20120611
 
Event date:31.07.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:31.08.2012 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20120611
 
Event date:08.07.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20130708
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20120613
 
Event date:22.06.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK EUP
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT EXPIRED
Effective DATE:20120630